Hughes v. Washburn
Petitioner: Martin Hughes
Respondent: Russell Washburn
Case Number: 2:2019cv00152
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Amend and MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Martin Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CAT)
September 9, 2019 Filing 31 Letter from Martin Hughes requesting docket sheet and Notice of change of address. Address updated from NORTHEAST CORRECTIONAL COMPLEX, P.O. BOX 5000, MOUNTAIN CITY, TN 37683 to TROUSDALE TURNER CORRECTIONAL CENTER, 140 MACON WAY, HARTSVILLE, TN 37074. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Copy of docket sheet mailed to Martin Hughes)(JCK)
September 3, 2019 Filing 30 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Martin Hughes. (ABF)
August 28, 2019 Filing 29 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, No Longer at the Facility, Unable to Forward. Mail sent to Martin Hughes re #23 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (Copy of Notice mailed to new address found on latest envelope) (CAT)
August 27, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Davison Douglas on behalf of Russell Washburn (Douglas, Richard)
August 26, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Declaratory Order by Martin Hughes. (ABF)
August 26, 2019 Filing 26 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Martin Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Other Envelope)(ABF)
August 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. Pursuant to SO 19-13. (JCK)
August 19, 2019 Filing 25 Letter from Martin Hughes (ABF)
August 16, 2019 Filing 23 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (Copy of Notice mailed to Martin Hughes)(JCK)
August 16, 2019 Filing 22 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-00199.
August 15, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/16/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REOPENING and TRANSFERRING CASE. The petitioner's motion to reopen ( #16 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to VACATE the order of dismissal ( #12 ) and the judgment entered on June 26, 2019 ( #13 ). The Clerk is DIRECTED to TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee, Northeastern Division at Greenville. The petitioner's remaining motions ( 18 and #19 ) are reserved for the receiving court. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/15/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/16/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 20 Letter and NOTICE of Change of Address by Martin Hughes. (Address Updated) (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/16/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Injunctive Relief by Martin Hughes. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/16/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 24 SEALED MOTION by Martin Hughes. Originally filed sealed as doc. 18 in Middle District case. Motion failed to transfer over correctly and had to be refiled. (JCK)
July 18, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of #16 MOTION to Reopen Case filed by Martin Hughes. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/16/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Reconsider/Reopen Case by Martin Hughes. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/16/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying as moot #14 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/3/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/16/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and to Take Judicial Notice by Martin Hughes. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/16/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 ***VACATED per #21 ORDER REOPENING CASE*** ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re: #12 Order Dismissing Case. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (gb) Modified text on 8/15/2019 (gb). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/16/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ***VACATED per #21 ORDER REOPENING CASE*** ORDER: This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with the court's previous order. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/26/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb) Modified text on 8/15/2019 (gb). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/16/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION (Unsigned) of Martin E. Hughes filed by Martin Hughes. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/16/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 Issues for Review filed by Martin Hughes re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/16/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Martin Hughes. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/16/2019.]
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Motion #5 GRANTED for 28-day extension to Pay Filing Fee. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/25/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/16/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Martin Hughes filed by Martin Hughes. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/16/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hardship by Martin Hughes. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/16/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee by Martin Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Letter Regarding Filing Fee)(gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/16/2019.]
March 26, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Richard Davison Douglas. (gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/16/2019.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Davison Douglas on behalf of Russell Washburn (Douglas, Richard) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/16/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The petitioner MUST, within 28 DAYS of the date this order is entered on the docket, either pay the $5.00 filing fee or submit a properly completed application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/20/19. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail including IFP application.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/16/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (afs) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/16/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (afs) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/16/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Martin Hughes. (afs) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 8/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Washburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Russell Washburn
Represented By: Richard Davison Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Martin Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?