Hamm v. Chrysler Group LLC
Plaintiff: Cameron Aaron Hamm
Defendant: Chrysler Group LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00169
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 2:30 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Curtis L Collier. (CBS)
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Chrysler Group LLC (Phillips, J)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 11/05/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AMP)
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cameron Aaron Hamm. Chrysler Group LLC served on 10/16/2019. (Parish, Daniel)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Chrysler Group LLC identifying Corporate Parent fca us llc for Chrysler Group LLC. (Phillips, J)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Chrysler Group LLC.(Phillips, J)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by J Britt Phillips on behalf of Chrysler Group LLC (Phillips, J)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint civil cover sheet by Cameron Aaron Hamm. (Parish, Daniel)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 SECOND Administrative Notice to Counsel #2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac), #1 Complaint: Please file a signed and dated Civil Cover Sheet using the event Supplement under Other Documents and link it to the Complaint. Requirements due by 10/22/2019. (AMP)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 10/07/2019. (AMP)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 10/07/2019. (AMP)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 10/07/2019. (AMP)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Chrysler Group LLC. (AMP)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel: Please file a signed and dated Civil Cover Sheet using the event Supplement under Other Documents and link it to the Complaint. Requirements due by 10/15/2019. (AMP)
October 7, 2019 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (AMP)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chrysler Group LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4096985.), filed by Cameron Aaron Hamm. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Parish, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamm v. Chrysler Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Aaron Hamm
Represented By: Daniel Vincent Parish
Represented By: Patrick M Ardis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrysler Group LLC
Represented By: J Britt Phillips
Represented By: Christopher James Schroeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?