Bruce et al v. Jet.com
Plaintiff: Autumn Bruce, Melissa Bruce and Charles Bruce
Defendant: JET.COM and Jet.com, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00175
Filed: October 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's counsel has filed a Joint Motion to Extend Time to File a Response [Doc. 10] wherein both parties agree to extend the deadline for Defendant to file an Answer or Response to the Complaint [Doc. 1] filed in this cause until the close of business December 13, 2019. The motion is GRANTED. Defendants are ORDERED to file a response to the Complaint [Doc. 1] by 5:00 p.m., Friday, December 13, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 11/19/2019. (CAT)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Jet.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Agreed Order Allowing Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Kern, Elle)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Elle G Kern on behalf of Jet.com, Inc. (Kern, Elle)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by George A Rowlett on behalf of Jet.com, Inc. (Rowlett, George)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Jet.com, Inc. on 10/22/19. (JBR)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 ***INFORMATIONAL ONLY**8Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint, :Summons and Civil Cover Sheet are interactive. Please make sure to flatten all documents. (BDG)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/15/2019. (BDG)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/15/2019. (BDG)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/15/2019. (BDG)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jet.com, Inc.. (BDG)
October 15, 2019 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (BDG)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4102546.), filed by Autumn Bruce, Melissa Bruce, Charles Bruce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Summons Summons for Issuance, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Other Attachment A to Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilson, Shelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruce et al v. Jet.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autumn Bruce
Represented By: Shelly L Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Bruce
Represented By: Shelly L Wilson
Represented By: Brandon Scott Criswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Bruce
Represented By: Shelly L Wilson
Represented By: Brandon Scott Criswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JET.COM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jet.com, Inc.
Represented By: George A Rowlett
Represented By: Elle G Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?