Moore v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (PLR2)
Plaintiff: Amy Beth Moore
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2019cv00180
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
2 Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have to and including January 20, 2020 in which to file his answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 12/17/2019. (AMP)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint - SSA, by Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. (McClanahan, Leah)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton no longer assigned to case Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 11/4/2019. (RET)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amy Beth Moore. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 10/28/2019. (Smith, Harry)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amy Beth Moore. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 10/29/2019. (Smith, Harry)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amy Beth Moore. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 10/28/2019. (Smith, Harry)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney, #2 Summons US Attorney General)(ABF)
October 23, 2019 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (ABF)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT Complaint against Social Security Administration, Commissioner of ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4109900.), filed by Amy Beth Moore. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons US Attorney General, #3 Summons General Counsel, #4 Summons US Attorney)(Smith, Harry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (PLR2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Represented By: Leah Walker McClanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Beth Moore
Represented By: Harry J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?