Oppenheimer v. Mountain States Health Alliance et al
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Defendant: Ballad Health and Mountain States Health Alliance
Case Number: 2:2019cv00189
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 10/29/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Dana LeJune) (AMP)
October 29, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice re: Dana L. LeJune ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4115466.) filed by David Oppenheimer (AMP)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice re: Dana L. LeJune ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4115466.) by David Oppenheimer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (Texas Bar), #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (SDTX), #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (TX S Ct), #4 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Sanders, Richard)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 PATENT AND TRADEMARK NOTICE in compliance with 35 USC 290 and/or 15 USC 1116 regarding VAu-1-156-824 17 USC 508 (Copyright). (Sanders, Richard)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 10/25/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Dana LeJune) (AMP)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 10/25/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Dana LeJune) (AMP)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 10/25/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Dana LeJune) (AMP)
October 25, 2019 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Ballad Health, Mountain States Health Alliance. (AMP)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney Dana LeJune is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/motion-admission-pro-hac-vice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Dana LeJune) (AMP)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel: Please file the Copyright form using the event Patent and Trademark Notice under Other Documents. Requirements due by 10/30/2019. (AMP)
October 25, 2019 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (AMP)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by David Oppenheimer re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Sanders, Richard)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Oppenheimer ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4113649.), filed by David Oppenheimer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit The Work, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Registration, #3 Exhibit Infringing Image, #4 Exhibit Letter to HSHA)(Sanders, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oppenheimer v. Mountain States Health Alliance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Represented By: Richard G Sanders, Jr.
Represented By: Dana A LeJune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ballad Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain States Health Alliance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?