Kimbrough v. Lincare, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ashley Brookshire and Geneva Kimbrough
Defendant: Lincare, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00214
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 01/21/2020. (AMP)
January 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CONSENT to Magistrate Judge by Lincare, Inc. (Babb, Edward)
January 16, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Babb, Edward)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/16/2019. (CAT)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Nonconsent) (JCK)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff by Lincare, Inc..(Babb, Edward)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/9/2019. (BJL)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/9/2019. (BJL)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 12/9/2019. (BJL)
December 6, 2019 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (BJL)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Lincare, Inc.. (Babb, Edward) Modified on 12/9/2019 (BJL). Added Corporate Parent - Lindcare Holdings Inc. to Lincare, Inc. Role - dft Added Corporate Parent - Linde PLC to Lincare, Inc. Role - dft
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lincare Inc from Greene County Circuit, case number CC-19-CV-446 BB. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4148283), filed by Lincare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Supplement State Removal Notice, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Babb, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimbrough v. Lincare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincare, Inc.
Represented By: Edward U Babb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Brookshire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geneva Kimbrough
Represented By: F Braxton Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?