The Celina Mutual Insurance Company v. Russell
Plaintiff: The Celina Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Russell K Josh and Josh K Russell
Case Number: 2:2020cv00004
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Plaintiff has filed a Motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint [Doc. 14]requesting the time for Defendant to respond to the Complaint be extended to March 31, 2020. Plaintiff avers the parties are attempting to resolve this matter without the necessity of Defendant retaining counsel and without either party filing dispositive motions. For good cause show, Plaintiffs Motion [Doc. 14] is GRANTED, and Defendants deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to March 31, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 3/9/2020. (JCK)
March 8, 2020 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by The Celina Mutual Insurance Company. (Tomkins, James)
March 8, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT re #12 Response to Order to Show Cause Declaration of James R. Tomkins by The Celina Mutual Insurance Company. (Tomkins, James)
March 8, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by The Celina Mutual Insurance Company. (Tomkins, James)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause in writing, on or before March 31, 2020, why its claims should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) for failure to prosecute. Plaintiff is hereby put ON NOTICE that if a response is not timely filed, its claims against Defendant may be dismissed. (Show Cause Response due by 3/31/2020.)Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 3/6/2020. (BJL)
January 27, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Celina Mutual Insurance Company. Josh K Russell served on 1/23/2020. (Tomkins, James)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Plaintiff has filed a Motion for admission of James R. Tomkins, Esq., pro hac vice in this action [Doc. 3]. The Motion is GRANTED. Counsel MUST register immediately as an EFiler in this district. The registration instructions can be found at the Court's website, www.tned.uscourts.gov, under "For Attorneys" and "Electronic Case Filing." Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 01/13/2020. (CAT)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 1/13/2020. (BDG)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 1/13/2020. (BDG)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 1/13/2020. (BDG)
January 13, 2020 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (BDG)
January 13, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Josh K Russell. (BDG)
January 13, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James R. Tomkins ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4190987.) filed by The Celina Mutual Insurance Company as to The Celina Mutual Insurance Company. (BDG)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Corporate Interest by The Celina Mutual Insurance Company. (Tomkins, James)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James R. Tomkins ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4190987.) by The Celina Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Tomkins, James)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Summons and Civil Cover Sheet by The Celina Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Tomkins, James)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment by against The Celina Mutual Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4190889.), filed by The Celina Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of Insurance Policy)(Tomkins, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Celina Mutual Insurance Company v. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell K Josh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh K Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Celina Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: James R Tomkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?