Orloff v. Westfield Insurance Company (TV1)
Plaintiff: John Orloff
Defendant: Westfield Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00007
Filed: January 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT Joint Notice by Westfield Insurance Company (Tomkins, James)
March 10, 2020 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge as required by prior court order. (AMP)
February 19, 2020 Filing 18 Westfield Insurance Company's ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint by Westfield Insurance Company.(Cope, Jon)
February 13, 2020 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Tomkins, James)
February 10, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Westfield Insurance Company., filed by John Orloff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jessee, Thomas)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff is accordingly DIRECTED to file the previously submitted first amended complaint [Doc. 14-1] as a new docket entry within ten (10) days of entry of this order. Once filed this complaint will supersede all previously filed complaints in this matter. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 2/10/20. (ABF)
February 5, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend/Revise Complaint by John Orloff. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(Jessee, Thomas)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying without prejudice #12 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 2/5/20. (JBR)
February 3, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Revise Complaint by John Orloff. (Jessee, Thomas)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/13/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2021 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/30/20. (JBR)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 01/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AMP)
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 Westfield Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint by Westfield Insurance Company.(Cope, Jon)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Defendant has filed a Motion for admission of James R. Tonkins, Esq., pro hac vice in this action [Doc. 2]. The Motion is GRANTED. Counsel MUST register immediately as an E-Filer in this district. The registration instructions can be found at the Court's website, www.tned.uscourts.gov, under "For Attorneys" and "Electronic Case Filing." Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 01/15/2020. (CAT)
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Westfield Insurance Company. (Tomkins, James)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 01/14/2020. (CAT)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 01/14/2020. (CAT)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 01/14/2020. (CAT)
January 14, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for James R. Tomkins regarding document: #2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James R. Tomkins ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4195034.) filed by Westfield Insurance Company (CAT)
January 14, 2020 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Westfield Insurance Company. (CAT)
January 14, 2020 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (CAT)
January 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Westfield Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court)(Tomkins, James)
January 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James R. Tomkins ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4195034.) by Westfield Insurance Company. (Tomkins, James)
January 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Carter County, Tennessee, case number C14665. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4195016), filed by Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copies of filings in state court action, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Tomkins, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orloff v. Westfield Insurance Company (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Orloff
Represented By: Thomas C Jessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westfield Insurance Company
Represented By: James R Tomkins
Represented By: Jon M Cope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?