McClellan v. Crown Asset Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carolyn D McClellan
Defendant: Crown Asset Management, LLC and Miller and Steeno, P.C.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00031
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION by Crown Asset Management, LLC. (Steeno, Michael)
March 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P Steeno on behalf of All Defendants (Steeno, Michael)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael P. Steeno. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 03/18/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Michael P. Steeno) (CAT)
March 18, 2020 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for Michael P. Steeno regarding document: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.00 receipt number G201247) filed by Crown Asset Management, LLC, Miller and Steeno, P.C. (CAT)
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael P Steeno (Filing fee $ 90.00 receipt number G201247) by Crown Asset Management, LLC, Miller and Steeno, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(CAT)
March 7, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carolyn D McClellan. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Other ROS - Miller and Steeno)(Lee, Alan)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information - Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 2/25/2020. (KMK)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss - Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 2/25/2020. (KMK)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions - Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 2/25/2020. (KMK)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Crown Asset Management, LLC and Miller and Steeno, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Other summons)(KMK)
February 25, 2020 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (KMK)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4240423.), filed by Carolyn D McClellan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lee Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Default Judgment, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons - Crown Asset, #5 Summons - Miller and Steeno)(Lee, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClellan v. Crown Asset Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn D McClellan
Represented By: Alan C Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Asset Management, LLC
Represented By: Michael P Steeno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller and Steeno, P.C.
Represented By: Michael P Steeno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?