Deskins v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Donna Gail Deskins
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2020cv00044
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Gail Deskins. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 4/16/2020. (Smith, Harry)
April 29, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Gail Deskins. SSA Office of General Counsel served on 4/16/2020. (Smith, Harry)
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Gail Deskins. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 4/20/2020. (Smith, Harry)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE re IFP Service (Attorney Representation) re #4 Summons Issued as to USA (JCK)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Attorney, #2 Summons U.S Attorney General)(JCK)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall send to Plaintiff's counsel the service packet to be completed by Counsel with appropriate instructions. It is Counsel's responsibility to return the service packet in a timely manner if the United States Marshall is to serve the complaint and summons for Plaintiff.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 4/1/20.This entry is the Order of the Court. There is no document attached. (KMG)
March 6, 2020 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (BDG)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Donna Gail Deskins. (Smith, Harry)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT Complaint against Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, filed by Donna Gail Deskins. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons US Attorney General, #3 Summons General Counsel, #4 Summons US Attorney)(Smith, Harry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deskins v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Gail Deskins
Represented By: Harry J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?