Cobble v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. (TV1)
Plaintiff: Zachary Cobble
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00056
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Springfield, Robert)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 04/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent / Non Consent) (CAT)
April 21, 2020 Filing 10 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Midland Credit Management, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Encore Capital Group, Inc. for Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Springfield, Robert)
April 21, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Midland Credit Management, Inc..(Springfield, Robert)
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zachary Cobble. Midland Credit Management, Inc. served on 4/3/2020. (Lee, Alan)
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, by Zachary Cobble. (Lee, Alan)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 03/30/2020. (CAT)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 03/30/2020. (CAT)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 03/30/2020. (CAT)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint : Please refile Exhibit 1 as a Supplement and link it back to the Complaint. Requirements due by 4/6/2020. (CAT)
March 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Midland Credit Management, Inc. (CAT)
March 30, 2020 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (CAT)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Midland Credit Management, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4285596.), filed by Zachary Cobble. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Civil Summons, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Midland)(Lee, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobble v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Cobble
Represented By: Alan C Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Franklin Springfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?