Lane v. Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Miranda D Lane
Defendant: Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00057
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case with prejudice as to all remaining Defendants by Miranda D Lane (Lee, Alan)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Notice of Settlement filed by Miranda D Lane. It is therefore ORDERED that the parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal on or before May 28, 2020. If additional time is needed, the parties shall file a motion. If the parties do not file a Stipulation of Dismissal or a motion requesting additional time by the specified date, this Court will dismiss the case based on the Notice of Settlement [Doc. 7]. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 04/28/2020. (AMP)
April 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Miranda D Lane Trial Date: N/A; Case Reported Settled By Alan C. Lee, Attorney for Plaintiff; Parties did not participate in mediation/arbitration. (Lee, Alan)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miranda D Lane. Wakefield & Associates, Inc. served on 4/6/2020. (Lee, Alan)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 03/30/2020. (AMP)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 03/30/2020. (AMP)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 03/30/2020. (AMP)
March 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (AMP)
March 30, 2020 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (AMP)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wakefield & Associates, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4285688.), filed by Miranda D Lane. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Wakefield)(Lee, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lane v. Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miranda D Lane
Represented By: Alan C Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?