Wyatt v. Blountville, TN et al
Plaintiff: Charles F Wyatt
Defendant: Blountville, TN and All Staff
Case Number: 2:2020cv00111
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Charles F Wyatt. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order to pay the full filing fee or to resubmit a fully completed application to support his request to proceed as a pauper. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a new in forma pauperis application form. Plaintiff is hereby NOTIFIED that if he fails to fully and timely comply with this order, the Court shall presume that Plaintiff is not a pauper, shall assess the full amount of fees, and shall order the case dismissed for want of prosecution. Plaintiff is ORDERED to immediately inform the Court and Defendant(s) of any address changes in writing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.13, it is the duty of a pro se party to promptly notify the Clerk and the other parties to the proceedings of any change in his or her address, to monitor the progress of the case, and to prosecute or defend the action diligently. Failure to provide a correct address to this Court within fourteen days of any change in address may result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 7/10/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Charles F. Wyatt). (LCK)
July 8, 2020 Address corrected, Address updated from 300 Washington Ave Apt 300, Lorain, OH 44052 to 300 Washington Ave Apt 303, Lorain, OH 44052. Orders and Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address re-mailed to Charles F. Wyatt at corrected address. (JCK)
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Charles Wyatt re #6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information, #5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss, #3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address, #4 Order Governing Depositions. (KDO)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential InformationSigned by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 6/4/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Charles F Wyatt)(JCK)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 6/4/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Charles F Wyatt)(JCK)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 6/4/2020. (Copy of Order mailed to Charles F Wyatt) (JCK)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (Copy of Notice mailed to Charles F. Wyatt)(JCK)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Staff, Blountville, TN (Filing fee NOT PAID), filed by Charles F Wyatt.(JCK)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles F Wyatt. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wyatt v. Blountville, TN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blountville, TN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles F Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?