McCravey v. Hawkins County Jail et al
Plaintiff: George McCravey
Defendant: Autumn Armstrong, Southern Health Partners, Butch Gallion, Hawkins County Jail and Ronnie Lawson
Case Number: 2:2020cv00189
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 9 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable sent to George McCravey re #7 Memorandum Opinion and #8 Judgment Order. (ADA)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT ORDER, this pro se prisoner's complaint for relief filed under 42 U.S.C. 1983 is DISMISSED for want of prosecution pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Because the Court CERTIFIED in the memorandum opinion that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, should Plaintiff file a notice of appeal, he is DENIED leave to appeal in forma pauperis.Signed by District Judge Clifton L. Corker on 10/8/20. (c/m)(ADA)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OPINION in support of the following Judgment Order. Signed by District Judge Clifton L. Corker on 10/8/20. (c/m George McCravey HAWKINS COUNTY JAIL 117 JUSTICE CENTER DRIVE ROGERSVILLE, TN 37857)(ADA)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable (return to sender) sent to George McCravey re #4 Order. (ADA)
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. Return to sender, Booked out. Mail sent to George McCravey re #3 Order (JCK) Modified on 9/30/2020 (ADA).
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, Plaintiff has not paid the required $400.00 filing fee, nor has he submitted the proper documents to proceed in forma pauperis. Specifically, Plaintiff has not filed a certified copy of his inmate trust account for the previous six- month period. Plaintiff shall have twenty-one (21) days from the date of entry of this order to pay the full filing fee or to submit the necessary documents. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff a prison account statement form. Plaintiff is hereby NOTIFIED that if he fails to fully timely comply with this order, the Court shall presume that Plaintiff is not a pauper and shall order the case dismissed for want of prosecution. Signed by District Judge Clifton L. Corker on 9/21/20. (c/m George McCravey HAWKINS COUNTY JAIL 117 JUSTICE CENTER DRIVE ROGERSVILLE, TN 37857 with blank account form)(ADA)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (Copy of Notice mailed to George McCravey) (AMP)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Autumn Armstrong, Butch Gallion, Hawkins County Jail, Ronnie Lawson, and Southern Health Partners (Filing fee NOT PAID), filed by George McCravey. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope) (AMP)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by George McCravey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AMP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCravey v. Hawkins County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autumn Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Health Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butch Gallion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawkins County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George McCravey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?