Arms et al v. SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Vickie Arms and Robert Arms
Defendant: SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC d/b/a Newport Health and Rehabilitation Center doing business as Newport Health and Rehabilitation Center and SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC doing business as Newport Health and Rehabilitation Center
Case Number: 2:2021cv00007
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC (Eaton, David)
March 3, 2021 Filing 15 SECOND Administrative Notice to Counsel #11 Notice of Consent/Nonconsent : Please refile Notice of Nonconsent using the form that was attached in Doc. 9. Please do not put parties names or signatures of attorneys if the case is not being consented to. Requirements due by 3/8/2021. (AMP)
February 10, 2021 Filing 14 Administrative Notice to Counsel #11 Notice of Consent/Nonconsent : Please refile Notice of Nonconsent using the form that was attached in Doc. 9. Please do not put parties names or signatures of attorneys if the case is not being consented to. Requirements due by 2/16/2021. (CAT)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Here, the parties agree that arbitration is appropriate in this case and is therefore not in issue. Upon consideration of the parties' joint motion, the motion is GRANTED. The parties are ORDERED to engage in individual arbitration, and this case shall be STAYED pending such arbitration. The parties shall file a joint status report 90 days of the date of this order advising the Court the status of the arbitration and within 14 days of the conclusion of arbitration.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 02/05/2021. (CAT)
February 5, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Refer Case to Arbitration by SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email correspondence, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order)(Eaton, David)
February 5, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC (Eaton, David)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court after a telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiffs' counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 01/20/2021. (AMP)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 01/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AMP)
January 19, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dispute Resolution Program)(Eaton, David)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 01/19/2021. (AMP)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 01/19/2021. (AMP)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 01/19/2021. (AMP)
January 19, 2021 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (AMP)
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Leon Carl Hagwood on behalf of SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC (Hagwood, Leon)
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David M Eaton on behalf of SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC (Eaton, David)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC. (Eaton, David)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cocke County Circuit Court, case number 35921-III. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4624399), filed by SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Wynn Sims, #4 Exhibit Summons and CT Corp Transmittal of Service)(Eaton, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arms et al v. SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Arms
Represented By: Francis X Santore, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Arms
Represented By: Francis X Santore, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC d/b/a Newport Health and Rehabilitation Center doing business as Newport Health and Rehabilitation Center
Represented By: David M Eaton
Represented By: Leon Carl Hagwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Newport Operating Company, LLC doing business as Newport Health and Rehabilitation Center
Represented By: David M Eaton
Represented By: Leon Carl Hagwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?