LPI, Inc. v. Johnston
Plaintiff: LPI, Inc.
Defendant: Brian Johnston doing business as Atlanta Hot Tub Center
Case Number: 2:2021cv00019
Filed: February 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION Of Extension To File Response To Complaint by Brian Johnston. (Grosko, Danica)
February 25, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Danica Renee Grosko on behalf of Brian Johnston (Grosko, Danica)
February 25, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Rocklan W King, III on behalf of Brian Johnston (King, Rocklan)
February 10, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LPI, Inc.. Brian Johnston served on 2/8/2021. (Dessauer, Mark)
February 4, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Brian Johnston. (AMP)
February 3, 2021 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Summons by LPI, Inc.. (Dessauer, Mark)
February 3, 2021 Filing 9 Administrative Notice to Counsel #7 Supplement : Please fill out the bottom section of first page with attorney's name and address. Please file this as a Supplement found under Other Documents and link it back to the Complaint. Requirements due by 2/8/2021. (CAT)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 02/03/2021. (CAT)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by LPI, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Dessauer, Mark)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 02/03/2021. (CAT)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 02/03/2021. (CAT)
February 3, 2021 Filing 4 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint : Please file a Civil Cover Sheet in a non-fillable format using the event Supplement under Other Documents and link it back to the Complaint. Requirements due by 2/8/2021. (CAT)
February 3, 2021 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (CAT)
February 3, 2021 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Brian Johnston. (CAT)
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by LPI, Inc.. (Dessauer, Mark)
February 2, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by LPI, Inc.. (Dessauer, Mark)
February 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brian Johnston ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4642876.), filed by LPI, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Dessauer, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LPI, Inc. v. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Johnston doing business as Atlanta Hot Tub Center
Represented By: Rocklan W King, III
Represented By: Danica Renee Grosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LPI, Inc.
Represented By: Mark S Dessauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?