Dunn v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Brandon L Dunn
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2021cv00020
Filed: February 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Filing 7 Administrative Notice to Counsel #6 Notice (Other) : Please refile Notice of Appearance using the event Notice of Appearance under Notices. Requirements due by 4/7/2021. (CAT)
April 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Social Security Administration, Commissioner of Notice of Appearance and Substitution of Counsel (Anderson, M)
March 4, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandon L Dunn. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 2/8/2021. (Smith, Harry)
March 4, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandon L Dunn. SSA Office of General Counsel served on 2/10/2021. (Smith, Harry)
March 4, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandon L Dunn. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 2/11/2021. (Smith, Harry)
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney, #2 Summons US Attorney General)(ABF)
February 4, 2021 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (ABF)
February 3, 2021 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT Complaint against Social Security Administration, Commissioner of ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4643570.), filed by Brandon L Dunn. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons US Attorney General, #3 Summons General Counsel, #4 Summons US Attorney)(Smith, Harry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon L Dunn
Represented By: Harry J Smith
Represented By: Mark Albert Skelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?