Johnson v. Ballad Health et al
Plaintiff: ALICIA JOHNSON
Defendant: Ballad Health and Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00050
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ballad Health.(Forrester, Michael)
April 26, 2021 Filing 12 Alias Summons Issued as to Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (CAT)
April 23, 2021 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT ALIAS SUMMONS by Alicia Johnson. (Darnell, David)
April 23, 2021 Filing 10 Administrative Notice to Counsel #9 Amended Document : Please add the word Alias to the Summons to be issued. Also, please file the Alias Summons using the event Supplement. Requirements due by 4/28/2021. (CAT)
April 22, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Alicia Johnson. Alias Summons. (Darnell, David)
April 7, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, by Ballad Health. (Forrester, Michael)
April 6, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L Forrester on behalf of Ballad Health (Forrester, Michael)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 3/15/21. (ABF)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 3/15/21. (ABF)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 3/15/21. (ABF)
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ballad Health, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Ballad Health)(ABF)
March 15, 2021 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (ABF)
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, by ALICIA JOHNSON. (Darnell, David)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4682634.), filed by ALICIA JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Summons Reliance Standard Life Ins, #5 Summons Ballad Health)(Darnell, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Ballad Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ballad Health
Represented By: Michael L Forrester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALICIA JOHNSON
Represented By: David N Darnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?