United States of America et al v. Walgreen Company (JRG1)
Plaintiff: State of Tennessee and United States of America
Defendant: Walgreen Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00080
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America, State of Tennessee. Walgreen Company waiver sent on 5/20/2021. (McConkey, Robert)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 5/11/21. (ABF)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 5/11/21. (ABF)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 5/11/21. (ABF)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (ABF)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to Walgreen Company.. (ABF)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Walgreen Company, filed by United States of America, State of Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Participating Provider Agreement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Plea Agreement)(McConkey, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Walgreen Company (JRG1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Tennessee
Represented By: Andrew B Campbell
Represented By: Nathan O'Neil Casey
Represented By: William A Hullender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Robert C McConkey, III
Represented By: Joseph Cuauhtemoc Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?