Gourley v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Beth Gourley
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States of America, Commissioner of Social Security, United States Attorn J. Douglas Overbay and Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2021cv00099
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beth Gourley. SSA Office of General Counsel served on 6/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Other Return Service Receipt)(Jones, Jacqulyn)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beth Gourley. SSA Office of General Counsel served on 6/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Other Return Service Receipt)(Jones, Jacqulyn)
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Attorney General served on 6/29/21. (Attachments: #1 Other Return Service Receipt)(Jones, Jacqulyn) Modified on 7/23/2021 to reflect correct document filed (AMP).
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons Office of Chief Regional Counsel, Region VII, #2 Summons US Attorney)(LCK)
June 21, 2021 Filing fee PAID: $ 402.00, receipt number G2013165. (LCK)
June 17, 2021 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (LCK)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402.), filed by Beth Gourley. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Attorney General, #3 Summons Chief Counsel, #4 Summons US Attorney)(Jones, Jacqulyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gourley v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorn J. Douglas Overbay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Gourley
Represented By: Jacqulyn Gaut Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?