T&C Leasing, Inc. v. Banks, et al.
Plaintiff: T&C LEASING, INC. d/b/a TEAM FUNDING SOLUTIONS and T&C Leasing, Inc. doing business as Team Funding Solutions
Defendant: John Banks, Banks, Banks & Light, Jason S. Light, Thomas R. Banks and Banks, Banks & Light formerly doing business as Banks & Banks formerly doing business as Banks, Banks & Banks
Case Number: 2:2021cv00100
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Crytzer
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 08/06/2021. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Nonconsent) (AMP)
August 5, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by John Banks, Thomas R. Banks, Banks, Banks & Light, Jason S. Light.(Moore, Nathaniel)
July 26, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by T&C Leasing, Inc.. Banks, Banks & Light served on 7/19/2021. (Day, David)
July 26, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by T&C Leasing, Inc. Jason S Light served on 7/19/2021. (Day, David) Modified on 7/27/2021 to reflect party and date served (AMP).
July 26, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by T&C Leasing, Inc.. John Banks served on 7/19/2021. (Day, David)
July 26, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by T&C Leasing, Inc.. Thomas R. Banks served on 7/19/2021. (Day, David)
July 21, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND by John Banks, Thomas R. Banks, Banks, Banks & Light, Jason S. Light. (Moore, Nathaniel)
July 21, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel Dale Moore on behalf of John Banks, Thomas R. Banks, Banks, Banks & Light, Jason S. Light (Moore, Nathaniel)
July 21, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L Bowman on behalf of All Defendants (Bowman, Robert)
July 1, 2021 Filing 8 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Edward M Graves III re #7 NOTICE of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac) (ABF)
June 22, 2021 Filing 7 Administrative Notice to Edward M. Graves, III: Attorney not registered as an E-Filer. Requirements due by 6/28/2021. (copy mailed to Edward Graves, III) (JBR)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 6/22/21. (JBR)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 6/22/21. (JBR)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 6/22/21. (JBR)
June 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John Banks, Thomas R. Banks, Banks, Banks & Light, Jason S. Light. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Banks, Banks & Light, #2 Summons Issued - John Banks, #3 Summons Issued - Jason Light)(JBR)
June 22, 2021 District Judge Katherine A Crytzer and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (JBR)
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by T&C LEASING, INC. d/b/a TEAM FUNDING SOLUTIONS. (Day, David)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas R. Banks, Banks, Banks & Light, John Banks, Jason S. Light ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BTNEDC-4765397.), filed by T&C LEASING, INC. d/b/a TEAM FUNDING SOLUTIONS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Granting Default Judgment, #2 Exhibit Order of Sale, #3 Exhibit Order Granting Relief from Stay, #4 Exhibit Foreclosure Notice, #5 Exhibit Email from Wilson & Associates, #6 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Thomas Banks, #8 Summons Banks, Banks & Light, #9 Summons John Banks, #10 Summons Jason Light)(Day, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T&C Leasing, Inc. v. Banks, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Banks
Represented By: Nathaniel Dale Moore
Represented By: Robert L Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banks, Banks & Light
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason S. Light
Represented By: Nathaniel Dale Moore
Represented By: Robert L Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas R. Banks
Represented By: Nathaniel Dale Moore
Represented By: Robert L Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banks, Banks & Light formerly doing business as Banks & Banks formerly doing business as Banks, Banks & Banks
Represented By: Nathaniel Dale Moore
Represented By: Robert L Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T&C LEASING, INC. d/b/a TEAM FUNDING SOLUTIONS
Represented By: David O Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T&C Leasing, Inc. doing business as Team Funding Solutions
Represented By: Edward M Graves, III
Represented By: Edward M Graves, Jr
Represented By: David O Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?