Gobble et al v. Bristol Gynecology and Obstetrics, P.C. et al (TV1)
Plaintiff: Brittany S. Gobble, Benjamin T. Gobble, O. L. G. and Brittany S Monette
Defendant: Bristol Gynecology and Obstetrics, P.C., M.D. David P. Russell and M.D. Haley L. Akin
Case Number: 2:2022cv00051
Filed: May 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE to the Honorable Cynthia Richardson Wyrick, United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 7/8/22. (ABF)
July 6, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF CONSENT by Benjamin T. Gobble, Brittany S. Gobble (Haynes, Olen)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/17/22. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent)) (KDO)
June 14, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Bristol Gynecology and Obstetrics, P.C..(Carter, Justin)
June 14, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by David P. Russell.(Carter, Justin)
June 14, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Haley L. Akin.(Carter, Justin)
May 31, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittany S. Gobble. Haley L. Akin served on 5/24/2022. (Bingham, John)
May 31, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittany S. Gobble. David P. Russell served on 5/24/2022. (Bingham, John)
May 31, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittany S. Gobble. Bristol Gynecology and Obstetrics, P.C. served on 5/24/2022. (Bingham, John)
May 23, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Clarence J Gideon, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Gideon, Clarence)
May 23, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Blake Carter on behalf of All Defendants (Carter, Justin)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/13/22. (JBR)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/13/22. (JBR)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/13/22. (JBR)
May 13, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Haley L. Akin, Bristol Gynecology and Obstetrics, P.C., David P. Russell. (JBR)
May 13, 2022 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (JBR)
May 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5059618.), filed by Brittany S. Gobble, Benjamin T. Gobble, O. L. G.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1(a), #3 Exhibit 1(b), #4 Exhibit 1(c), #5 Exhibit 1(d), #6 Exhibit 1(e), #7 Exhibit 1(f), #8 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Faith, #9 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons Bristol Gynecology and Obstetrics, P.C., #11 Summons David P. Russell, M.D., #12 Summons Haley L. Akin, M.D.)(Bingham, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gobble et al v. Bristol Gynecology and Obstetrics, P.C. et al (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany S. Gobble
Represented By: John S Bingham
Represented By: Michael E Large
Represented By: Olen G Haynes, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin T. Gobble
Represented By: John S Bingham
Represented By: Michael E Large
Represented By: Olen G Haynes, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O. L. G.
Represented By: John S Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany S Monette
Represented By: Olen G Haynes, Jr
Represented By: John S Bingham
Represented By: Michael E Large
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol Gynecology and Obstetrics, P.C.
Represented By: Clarence J Gideon, Jr
Represented By: Justin Blake Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. David P. Russell
Represented By: Clarence J Gideon, Jr
Represented By: Justin Blake Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Haley L. Akin
Represented By: Clarence J Gideon, Jr
Represented By: Justin Blake Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?