Johnson City Energy Authority v. Connect Holding, LLC et al (TV1)
Plaintiff: Johnson City Energy Authority doing business as Brightridge
Defendant: Connect Holding, LLC and Connect Holding II, LLC
Counter Claimant: Brightspeed of Eastern Tennessee, LLC and Brightspeed of Southern Tennessee, LLC
Counter Defendant: Johnson City Energy Authority
Case Number: 2:2022cv00133
Filed: October 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 Filing 33 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Zralek, Stephen)
December 19, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Johnson City Energy Authority (Dessauer, Mark)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Permitting Defendants/Counter-Plaintiff to serve the requests for production of documents contained in Doc. 26-1 on Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant (Plaintiff). Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant shall then respond to those requests no later than January 6, 2023, but will also produce documents responsive thereto sooner, and on a rolling basis, if they are available. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 12/16/22. (GRE)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anna G. Schuler. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 12/15/2022. (Copy mailed to Atty Anna G. Schuler) (AGG)
December 15, 2022 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anna G. Schuler ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5246245.) filed by Brightspeed of Eastern Tennessee, LLC, Connect Holding II, LLC, Connect Holding, LLC, Brightspeed of Southern Tennessee, LLC (AMP)
December 14, 2022 Filing 29 SUPPLEMENT to #28 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac), #27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anna G. Schuler ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5246245.) by Brightspeed of Eastern Tennessee, LLC, Brightspeed of Southern Tennessee, LLC, Connect Holding II, LLC, Connect Holding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing for Anna Schuler)(Zralek, Stephen)
December 14, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) #27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anna G. Schuler ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5246245.) : Ms. Schuler needs to provide additional information and needs to sign the pleading declaring under penalty of perjury that the information is true and correct. Please refer to the Court's form located at https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/forms/motion-admission-pro-hac-vice. (AMP)
December 13, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anna G. Schuler ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5246245.) by Brightspeed of Eastern Tennessee, LLC, Brightspeed of Southern Tennessee, LLC, Connect Holding II, LLC, Connect Holding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing for Anna Schuler)(Zralek, Stephen)
December 12, 2022 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Limited Discovery in Advance of the Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Brightspeed of Eastern Tennessee, LLC, Brightspeed of Southern Tennessee, LLC, Connect Holding II, LLC, Connect Holding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - proposed Requests for Production, #2 Other Proposed Order)(Zralek, Stephen)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 2/27/2024 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2024 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/12/22. (ABF)
December 5, 2022 Filing 24 ANSWER to #15 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Johnson City Energy Authority.(Dessauer, Mark)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING AND ESTABLISHING DEADLINES RELATED THERETO. This matter came before the Court for a Status Conference on December 1, 2022. During the conference, the Court set a hearing on Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction (the "Motion") [Doc. 8] for January 25 & 26, 2023, beginning each day at 9:00 a.m. EST. Following the status conference, counsel for both sides met and conferred and agreed upon the deadlines in advance of the preliminary injunction hearing, mindful of the approaching winter holidays, which the Court finds to be appropriate. The Court hereby orders as follows: See Order for details. (Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2023 and 1/26/2023 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 300 - Greeneville before Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 12/5/2022. (LCK)
December 1, 2022 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick: Status Conference held on 12/1/2022. Order to enter. (Court Reporter DCR)(Tape #1:38 - 1:52) (AGG)
November 22, 2022 Filing 21 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Connect Holding, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Connect Midco LLC, Corporate Parent Connect Intermediate LLC, Corporate Parent Connect Parent Company for Connect Holding, LLC, Connect Holding, LLC. (Zralek, Stephen)
November 22, 2022 Filing 20 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Connect Holding II, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Connect Holding, LLC, Corporate Parent Connect Midco LLC, Corporate Parent Connect Intermediate LLC, Corporate Parent Connect Parent Company for Connect Holding II, LLC, Connect Holding II, LLC. (Zralek, Stephen)
November 22, 2022 Filing 19 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Brightspeed of Southern Tennessee, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Connect Holding, LLC, Corporate Parent Connect Holding II, LLC, Corporate Parent Connect Midco LLC, Corporate Parent Connect Intermediate LLC, Corporate Parent Connect Parent Company for Brightspeed of Southern Tennessee, LLC, Brightspeed of Southern Tennessee, LLC. (Zralek, Stephen)
November 22, 2022 Filing 18 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Brightspeed of Eastern Tennessee, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Connect Holding, LLC, Corporate Parent Connect Holding II, LLC, Corporate Parent Connect Midco LLC, Corporate Parent Connect Intermediate LLC, Corporate Parent Connect Parent Company for Brightspeed of Eastern Tennessee, LLC, Brightspeed of Eastern Tennessee, LLC. (Zralek, Stephen)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER a Status Conference set for 12/1/2022 at 1:30 PM via video conference before Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick. Videoconferencing information will be sent tocounsel by the Clerks office prior to the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 11/22/22. (KDO)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Nonconsent) (AMP)
November 21, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Johnson City Energy Authority by Brightspeed of Southern Tennessee, LLC, Connect Holding II, LLC, Connect Holding, LLC, Brightspeed of Eastern Tennessee, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - May 4, 2022 Response Letter)(Zralek, Stephen)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Hearing filed by Johnson City Energy Authority referred to the Honorable Cynthia R. Wyrick, USMJ. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/16/22. (ABF)
November 14, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Johnson City Energy Authority. Brightspeed of Southern Tennessee, LLC served on 10/31/2022. (Dessauer, Mark)
November 14, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Johnson City Energy Authority. Connect Holding II, LLC served on 10/31/2022. (Dessauer, Mark)
November 2, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Johnson City Energy Authority. Brightspeed of Eastern Tennessee, LLC served on 10/31/2022. (Dessauer, Mark)
November 2, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Johnson City Energy Authority. Connect Holding, LLC served on 10/29/2022. (Dessauer, Mark)
October 31, 2022 Filing 9 PATENT AND TRADEMARK NOTICE in compliance with 35 USC 290 and/or 15 USC 1116 regarding 5,752,193 5,752,191 5,537,253 5,537,252 97131164 . (Dessauer, Mark)
October 27, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Hearing by Johnson City Energy Authority. (Dessauer, Mark)
October 27, 2022 Filing 7 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Johnson City Energy Authority. (Dessauer, Mark)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information, Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/26/2022. (BJL)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss, Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/26/2022. (BJL)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions, Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/26/2022. (BJL)
October 26, 2022 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel requirements due by 10/31/2022. (BJL)
October 26, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Brightspeed of Eastern Tennessee, LLC, Brightspeed of Southern Tennessee, LLC, Connect Holding II, LLC, Connect Holding, LLC. (BJL)
October 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brightspeed of Eastern Tennessee, LLC, Brightspeed of Southern Tennessee, LLC, Connect Holding II, LLC, Connect Holding, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5205949.), filed by Johnson City Energy Authority d/b/a Brightridge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Dessauer, Mark)
October 26, 2022 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (BJL)
October 26, 2022 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Johnson City Energy Authority. (BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson City Energy Authority v. Connect Holding, LLC et al (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson City Energy Authority doing business as Brightridge
Represented By: Mark S Dessauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connect Holding, LLC
Represented By: Stephen J. Zralek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connect Holding II, LLC
Represented By: Stephen J. Zralek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Brightspeed of Eastern Tennessee, LLC
Represented By: Stephen J. Zralek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Brightspeed of Southern Tennessee, LLC
Represented By: Stephen J. Zralek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Johnson City Energy Authority
Represented By: Mark S Dessauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?