Rogers v. Lawson et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Rogers
Defendant: Ronnie Lawson, Butch Gallion, Hawkins County Sheriff's Department, Southern Health Partners, Inc., Matthews and Emma Arnold
Case Number: 2:2023cv00137
Filed: October 13, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Pro Se Educational ORDER, Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/22/2023. (BJL) Mailed to Matthew Rogers HAWKINS COUNTY JAIL 117 JUSTICE CENTER DRIVE ROGERSVILLE, TN 37857 (Main Document 7 replaced on 11/22/2023) (BJL).
November 22, 2023 Filing 6 Request for documents by Matthew Rogers (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BJL)*Requested documents mailed to Matthew Rogers HAWKINS COUNTY JAIL 117 JUSTICE CENTER DRIVE ROGERSVILLE, TN 37857
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by Matthew Rogers (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BJL)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: the Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff an inmate trust account certificate, and Plaintiff is ORDERED to show this order to the custodian of trust accounts at the Hawkins County Jail, who is ORDERED to either (1) complete, sign, and notarize the inmate trust account statement form with Plaintiff's information, or (2) provide Plaintiff with a form that is the institutional equivalent. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order to pay the full filing fee or submit the necessary documents. Plaintiff is hereby NOTIFIED that if he fails to fully and timely comply with this order, the Court shall presume that Plaintiff is not a pauper, assess him the full amount of fees, and order the case dismissed for want of prosecution. Also, the Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this order to the Sheriff of Hawkins County, as he may wish to inquire into whether officials at Hawkins County Jail are complying with the requirements of the PLRA. Plaintiff is NOTIFIED that the Court WILL NOT consider any amendments and/or supplements to the complaint or any other kind of motion for relief until after the Court has screened the complaint pursuant to the PLRA. Plaintiff is ORDERED to immediately inform the Court and Defendants of any address changes in writing. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/24/2023. (BJL)*Mailed to Matthew Rogers with a certificate of inmate account and mailed this order to the Sheriff of Hawkins, and Custodian of inmate accounts at: HAWKINS COUNTY JAIL 117 JUSTICE CENTER DRIVE ROGERSVILLE, TN 37857
October 13, 2023 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (Copy of Notice mailed to Matthew Rogers) (CAT)
October 13, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Emma Arnold, Butch Gallion, Hawkins County Sheriff's Department, Ronnie Lawson, Matthews, Southern Health Partners, Inc. (Filing fee NOT PAID), filed by Matthew Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CAT)
October 13, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Matthew Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Lawson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butch Gallion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawkins County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Health Partners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emma Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?