Phillips et al v. Zhen et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Dawn Phillips, Timothy Harold Phillips and Abigail Rose Phillips
Defendant: Gehua Zhen, Charles Brandt and Edo 's Trucking
Case Number: 2:2024cv00008
Filed: January 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Katherine A Crytzer
Referring Judge: Cynthia R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2024 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Abigail Rose Phillips, Lisa Dawn Phillips, Timothy Harold Phillips. (McAfee, Timothy)
February 13, 2024 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Charles Brandt, Edo 's Trucking, Gehua Zhen., filed by Abigail Rose Phillips, Lisa Dawn Phillips, Timothy Harold Phillips.(McAfee, Timothy)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SECOND ORDER REGARDING JURISDICTION: The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to file a response to this Order on or before February 20, 2024 with facts sufficient to show that this Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action. A failure to respond will be grounds for the Court to dismiss this action. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 2/7/24. (ABF)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Amend/Correct. Because Defendants have not yet even been served in this matter, Plaintiffs are entitled to amend their complaint as a matter of course. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' Motion [Doc. 7] is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to file an amended complaint on or before February 20, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick on 02/06/2024. (AGG)
February 2, 2024 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Abigail Rose Phillips, Lisa Dawn Phillips, Timothy Harold Phillips. (McAfee, Timothy)
February 2, 2024 Filing 7 First MOTION to Amend/Revise #1 Complaint To Correct Name of Defendant by Abigail Rose Phillips, Lisa Dawn Phillips, Timothy Harold Phillips. (McAfee, Timothy)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING JURISDICTION: The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to file a response to this Order on or before February 16, 2024 with facts sufficient to show that this Court has jurisdiction over the action. A failure to respond will be grounds for the Court to dismiss this action.Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 2/2/24. (ABF)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 1/22/2024. (LCK)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 1/22/2024. (LCK)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 1/22/2024. (LCK)
January 22, 2024 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint: No Civil Cover Sheet included with Complaint. (Requirements due by 1/29/2024). (LCK)
January 22, 2024 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to all Defendants. (LCK)
January 19, 2024 District Judge Katherine A Crytzer and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (LCK)
January 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNEDC-5571379.), filed by Abigail Rose Phillips, Lisa Dawn Phillips, Timothy Harold Phillips.(McAfee, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips et al v. Zhen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Dawn Phillips
Represented By: Timothy W McAfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Harold Phillips
Represented By: Timothy W McAfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abigail Rose Phillips
Represented By: Timothy W McAfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gehua Zhen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edo 's Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?