Stevens v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kelly Stevens
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA Office of the General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2024cv00217
Filed: December 10, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 2/7/25. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
February 6, 2025 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT by Commissioner of Social Security. (Fitzhugh, Nicol)
February 6, 2025 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicol Fitzhugh on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Fitzhugh, Nicol)
December 18, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Antolic Gross on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Gross, Nicole)
December 17, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Commencement of Social Security Action re #1 SSA COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (ABF)
December 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 12/17/24. (ABF)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: #https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 12/13/2024. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. (HSN)
December 11, 2024 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (MKM)
December 11, 2024 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete as to Bryan Konoski regarding document: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNEDC-5856669) filed by Kelly Stevens (MKM)
December 10, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNEDC-5856669.) by Kelly Stevens. (Konoski, Bryan)
December 10, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kelly Stevens. (Konoski, Bryan)
December 10, 2024 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Kelly Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Konoski, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of the General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Nicole Antolic Gross
Represented By: Nicol Fitzhugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Stevens
Represented By: Bryan Konoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?