Laney v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Donald Glen Laney
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of the General Counsel
Case Number: 2:2025cv00017
Filed: January 16, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charles E Atchley
Referring Judge: Jill E McCook
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Antolic Gross on behalf of Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (Gross, Nicole)
January 29, 2025 Filing 8 NOTICE of Commencement of Social Security Action re #1 SSA COMPLAINT (MKM) Modified text on 1/30/2025 (ABF).
January 29, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 1/29/2025. (MKM)
January 24, 2025 Filing 6 Second MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald Glen Laney. (Darnell, David)
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the application is DEFICIENT. These deficiencies must be cured within thirty (30) days or the Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis will be DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on 1/22/25. (ABF)
January 20, 2025 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald Glen Laney. (Darnell, David)
January 17, 2025 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: Wrong document attached - please refile Motion for Leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Requirements due by 1/22/2025. (MKM)
January 17, 2025 District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook added. (MKM)
January 16, 2025 Filing 2 [WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED; REFILED AS #4 ] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald Glen Laney. (Darnell, David) Modified on 1/21/2025 (ABF).
January 16, 2025 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, filed by Donald Glen Laney. (Attachments: #1 Summons atty general, #2 Summons gen cousnel, #3 Summons US Attorney, #4 Other civil cover sheet)(Darnell, David) Modified text on 1/30/2025 (ABF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laney v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Glen Laney
Represented By: David N Darnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Represented By: Nicole Antolic Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of the General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?