Marlow v. America's Collectible Network, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Patara Marlow
Defendant: America's Collectibles Network, Inc., Multimedia Commerce Group, Inc and MCG Merger Sub, Inc
Case Number: 3:2008cv00249
Filed: June 26, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: Knox
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Presiding Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 18 Motion for Summary Judgment - Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/03/2010. (KMK)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Court OVERRULES Plaintiff's Objections 30 and AFFIRMS in whole the memorandum and order 27 issued by Judge Guyton in which Judge Guyton ordered plaintiff to make initial disclosures and complete all overdue discovery allegations on or before 5/28/10 and gave defendants leave to file a motion to dismiss or for other sanctions if plaintiff failed to comply. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 7/6/10. (ABF)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying 33 plaintiff's Motion to Amend Court's Scheduling Order to Extend Time for Completion of Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on July 1, 2010. (AYB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marlow v. America's Collectible Network, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patara Marlow
Represented By: Roy P Neuenschwander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America's Collectibles Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Multimedia Commerce Group, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCG Merger Sub, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?