Matlock v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: William Douglas Matlock
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv00420
Filed: July 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Monroe
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The Court ACCEPTS IN WHOLE the 31 Report and Recommendation. It is ORDERED, for the reasons stated in the Report and Recommendation, which the Court adopts and incorporates into its ruling, that this action shall be DISMISSED, but without prejudice. The trial scheduled for March 3, 2015 is CANCELLED. Defendant's motion in limine 26 is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 11/19/14. (JBR)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Memorandum and Order. The Court finds that the Defendants' Motion to Compel [Doc. 22] is well-taken, and it is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ORDERED to serve counsel for the Defendant with full and complete responses to the interrogatories and requests for production served December 3, 2013, on or before September 2, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 8/15/14. (JBR)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, the Court GRANTS the Defendant's request, and the Plaintiff is instructed to supplement his discovery responses on or before June 4, 2014. In addition, the Court DIRECTS Attorney Kinnard to obtain the Plaintiff's availability so that Plaintiff's deposition may be scheduled to take place within the next two to three months. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 5/22/14. (JBR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matlock v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Latisha Jan Stubblefield
Represented By: Kenny L. Saffles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Douglas Matlock
Represented By: J Lewis Kinnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?