Farivar v. Ledbetter et al (TV1)

Plaintiff: Franco Farivar
Defendant: Dennis Ledbetter, Larry Lawson, Rick Hamby, Morgan County Sheriff's Department and Morgan County, Tennessee
Case Number: 3:2014cv00076
Filed: February 28, 2014
Court: Tennessee Eastern District Court
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Morgan
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Presiding Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2017 96 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/13/17. (c/m) (JBR)
October 11, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's Request for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal [Doc. 82 ] is DENIED and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or Alternatively, Continue Trial [Doc. 83 ] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 2/27/2017 at 1:30 PM. Jury Trial reset for 3/6/2017 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/11/16. (c/m)(JBR)
September 21, 2016 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 65 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 9/21/16. (c/m) (JBR)
August 26, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment [Doc. 36 ] is GRANTED. Plaintiff's state and federal claims against Morgan County, the Morgan County Sheriffs Department, and Ledbetter, and § 1983 claims against Lawson and Hamby in their official capacities are DISMISSED as barred by claim preclusion. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/26/16. (JBR) Modified to reflect c/m on 8/26/2016 (JBR).
July 13, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary judgment [Doc. 38 ], the Request for Court Ordered Mediation [Doc. 41 ], t he Plaintiff's Motion to Compel [Doc. 45 ], and the Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Compel [Doc. 48 ], and DENIES AS MOOT the Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time [Doc. 44 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 7/13/16. (JBR) Modified to reflect c/m on 7/13/2016 (JBR).
April 26, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion. The dispositive motion deadline is reset to June 3, 2016, and the trial in this matter is RESET to October 24, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. Unless otherwise ordered by the District Court, all other deadlines as set forth in the Scheduling Order [Doc. 18] shall remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 4/26/16. (JBR) Modified to reflect c/m on 4/26/2016 (JBR).
December 2, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff shall file his proposed, amended Complaint as a supplement/exhibit to his motion on or before December 21, 2015. The Defendants will have up to and including January 11, 2016, in which to respond to the proposed, a mended Complaint, and the Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint is HELD IN ABEYANCE until January 12, 2016. Alternatively, if the Plaintiff fails to supplement his motion with a proposed, amended Complaint, consistent with E.D. Tenn. L.R. 15.1, on or before December 21, 2015, the Court will DENY the motion without receiving further briefing on the issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 12/2/15. (c/m) (JBR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farivar v. Ledbetter et al (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franco Farivar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Ledbetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Hamby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan County, Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?