Farrell v. Finchum Sports Floors et al (TV2)
Plaintiff: Lauri Farrell
Defendant: Finchum Sports Floors and Larry Finchum
Case Number: 3:2014cv00565
Filed: December 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Knox
Presiding Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Presiding Judge: C Clifford Shirley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 65 Motion. The trial in this matter SHALL be continued to August 28, 2018. The parties SHALL appear before the Court on August 21, 2018, at 1:30 p.m., for a pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 2/16/18. (JBR)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 53 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. This case remains set for trial on March 27, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on 1/3/18. (JBR)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on 6/9/17. (JBR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farrell v. Finchum Sports Floors et al (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauri Farrell
Represented By: James L Holt, Jr
Represented By: Gordon E Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Finchum Sports Floors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Finchum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?