Murray v. Williams et al (TV3)
Plaintiff: Loretta Murray, Billy Dean Murray, Bobby Dean Murray and Roger A Murray
Defendant: Frank Williams, Roane County Chancellor, Denise Butler, Mark N Foster, Dennis Miracle, Glenda Faye Miracle, Roane County, Michelle Rios, Tywanna Walker, Rochelle Oldfield, Tennessee Department of Children's Services, Emily Hardin, Lucy Guy, Michael Murphy, Vicky Murphy, Mitchell Grigsby and Roane County E. 911 Center
Case Number: 3:2015cv00284
Filed: July 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Roane
Presiding Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Presiding Judge: C Clifford Shirley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER: The Court ACCEPTS IN WHOLE the R&R [Doc. 100 ]. As such, Plaintiffs' Motion for Stay of Execution of Sanction [Doc. 92 ] is hereby DENIED. In addition, plaintiffs' Petition for Writ of Supersedeas and Application for Temporary Stay Pending Appeal [Doc. 101 ] is also DENIED. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/7/17. (JBR) Modified to reflect c/m on 6/7/2017 (JBR).
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 91 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on 3/22/17. (c/m) (JBR)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER: The Court hereby OVERRULES plaintiffs objection 86 . Accordingly, the Court ACCEPTS IN WHOLE the R&R 85 , which the Court incorporates into its ruling. Defendants Motion for Award of Fees Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1988 [ 75] is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Court hereby AWARDS the Miracles $1,224.00 in attorneys fees and $90.76 in expenses, for a total award of $1,314.76. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/1/17. (c/m) (ABF)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED, within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order, to show cause why the case against defendants Michelle Rios, Tennessee Department of Children's Services, and Denise Butler should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/22/16. (c/m) (JBR)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 16 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on 9/15/15. (c/m) (JBR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. Williams et al (TV3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Dean Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Dean Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger A Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Williams
Represented By: Mary Byrd Ferrara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roane County Chancellor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark N Foster
Represented By: Mark N Foster
Represented By: Mark N Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Miracle
Represented By: Mark N Foster
Represented By: Mark N Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenda Faye Miracle
Represented By: Mark N Foster
Represented By: Mark N Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roane County
Represented By: Gary M Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tywanna Walker
Represented By: Mary Byrd Ferrara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochelle Oldfield
Represented By: Darryl G Lowe
Represented By: Darryl G Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Department of Children's Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Hardin
Represented By: Gary M Prince
Represented By: Gary M Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucy Guy
Represented By: Gary M Prince
Represented By: Gary M Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Murphy
Represented By: Robert Casey Daganhardt
Represented By: Gary M Prince
Represented By: Gary M Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicky Murphy
Represented By: Russell W Adkins
Represented By: Robert Casey Daganhardt
Represented By: Gary M Prince
Represented By: Russell W Adkins
Represented By: Gary M Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Grigsby
Represented By: Gary M Prince
Represented By: Gary M Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roane County E. 911 Center
Represented By: Russell W Adkins
Represented By: Gary M Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?