Larango v. Wolfe (PLR1)
Plaintiff: Shane Larango
Defendant: Jason Wolfe
Case Number: 3:2015cv00352
Filed: August 13, 2015
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Presiding Judge: C Clifford Shirley
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER, Plaintiffs Motion for Contempt 44 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. If the parties are able to resolve this matter, they shall inform the Court immediately. The parties shall appear before the undersigned on October 16, 2018, at 1:30 p.m., to address all pending motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 8/8/18. (ADA)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: The Court ACCEPTS IN WHOLE the Report and Recommendation under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1); Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(b). It is ORDERED, for the reasons stated in the Report and Recommendation, which the Court adopts and incorporates in to its ruling that Plaintiff be awarded $6,127.50 in attorneys fees and $633.35 in costs from defendant. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/20/16. (ABF) Modified on 12/20/2016 to indicate c/m to Jason Wolfe at 202 Easton Road, Kingston, TN 37763 (ABF).
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OPINION in support of the following Judgment. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/11/16. (ADA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larango v. Wolfe (PLR1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Larango
Represented By: James W Friauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?