Almanza v. Lynch (TV3)
Plaintiff: Michelle Almanza
Defendant: Loretta Lynch
Case Number: 3:2015cv00389
Filed: August 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Knox
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Presiding Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 122 Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Stay and Re-Open Discovery. Defendant's Motion to Supplement 125 is GRANTED. The Court will contact the parties to schedule a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs [Doc. 130] and Supplemental Motion [Doc. 148], which are now fully ripe. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on May 9, 2019. (AYB)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER, the Motion for Stay of Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion For Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs, or in the Alternative, a 30-day Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion 133 is GRANTED IN PART AND DE NIED IN PART. Defendant shall file the response to Plaintiff's Motion on or before February 11, 2019, and Plaintiff shall file her reply brief on or before February 28, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 1/8/19. (ADA)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER; The parties appeared telephonically before the Court on October 31, 2017, for a status conference regarding discovery. The Defendant stated, and the Plaintiff acknowledged, that he produced additional documents on October 27, 2017. The Plaintiff stated that the status of her discovery requests is unknown since she has not had time to review the recent document production. Accordingly, the Court scheduled another telephonic status conference for November 14, 2017, at 1:30 p.m., to address any remaining discovery disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 11/9/17. (ADA)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order; The parties appeared telephonically before the Court on October 4, 2017, for a status conference regarding discovery. The Defendant stated that the Mission Statement [Doc. 21-1] should be filed under seal, and the Plaintiff responded that she had no objection with placing the document under seal. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to place Doc. 21-1 under seal. The Court scheduled another telephonic status conference for October 31, 2017, at 10:00 a.m., to address any remaining discovery disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 10/10/17. (ADA) Modified on 10/10/2017 to note that the document to be sealed is [21-2] upon verification with chambers (ADA).
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 9/5/17. (JBR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almanza v. Lynch (TV3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Almanza
Represented By: Maha M Ayesh
Represented By: Jennifer B Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretta Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?