Osborne et al v. Kniceley (PLR1)
Plaintiff: Carl C Osborne and Janice K Osborne
Defendant: Steven E Kniceley
Case Number: 3:2016cv00004
Filed: January 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Campbell
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Presiding Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part (51) Motion to Compel in case 3:16-cv-00004-PLR-HBG; granting in part and denying in part (54) Motion to Compel in case 3:16-cv-00024-PLR-HBG. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 5/24/17. Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-00004-PLR-HBG, 3:16-cv-00024-PLR-HBG (JBR) Modified to reflect c/m on 5/24/2017 (JBR).
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The Plaintiff's Motion to Amend [Doc. 37 ] is GRANTED. The Plaintiff shall file his Amended Complaint as his operative pleading in CMC/ECF on or before May 26, 2017; The Request for Entry of Default [D oc. 40 ] is DENIED; The Motion to Strike Answer of Defendant Steven Kniceley [Doc. 46 ] is DENIED; and Defendant Kniceley's Supplemental Objection and Response in Opposition to Request for Entry of Default, Motion to Amend Answer to Amende d Complaint or in the Alternative Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint [Doc. 47 ] is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 5/15/17. Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-00004-PLR-HBG, 3:16-cv-00024-PLR-HBG (JBR) Modified text on 5/15/2017 (JBR).
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: The Defendants SHALL file their response to the oral motion on or before May 5, 2017. The Defendants' Objection to Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosure [Doc. 34 ] is DENIED. The Plaintiff's Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Extend Discovery Deadline [Doc. 38 ] is well-taken, and it is GRANTED. The deadline to complete all discovery shall be extended to July 3, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 5/2/17. Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-00004-PLR-HBG, 3:16-cv-00024-PLR-HBG (JBR) Modified to reflect c/m on 5/2/2017 (JBR).
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting (39) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Plaintiffs are hereby ADMONISHED that they are DEEMED to be proceeding pro se in their prosecution of damages, See No. 3:16-cv-24. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 4/19/17. Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-00004-PLR-HBG, 3:16-cv-00024-PLR-HBG (c/m to Plaintiffs) (JBR)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 3/6/17. Associated Cases: 3:16-cv-00004-PLR-HBG, 3:16-cv-00024-PLR-HBG(JBR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osborne et al v. Kniceley (PLR1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl C Osborne
Represented By: M Christopher Coffey
Represented By: Harry Stephen Gillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice K Osborne
Represented By: M Christopher Coffey
Represented By: Harry Stephen Gillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven E Kniceley
Represented By: Terrill L Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?