Hoskins Oil Company, LLC v. Equilon Enterprises LLC et al (JRG1)
Plaintiff: Hoskins Oil Company, LLC
Defendant: Equilon Enterprises LLC, Motiva Enterprises LLC, Coffman Oil Company, Inc., Downey Oil Company, Inc. and Manuel Payan
Case Number: 3:2016cv00417
Filed: June 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Presiding Judge: C Clifford Shirley
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15:2801
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER granting 168 Motion in Limine; granting 174 Motion in Limine; granting 180 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 4/11/19. (JBR, )
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Plaintiff's Objection and Motion in Limine to Defendants' Deposition Designations [Doc. 163] is GRANTED; Defendants' Motions in Limine [Docs. 164, 169, 170, 171, 181, and 185] are GRANTED; Defend ants' Motions in Limine [Docs. 165, 166 and 178] are DENIED; Defendants' Motions in Limine [Docs. 167, 172, 173, 177, 179, and 184] are DENIED AS MOOT; Defendants' Motions in Limine [Docs. 176, 183, and 186] are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDI CE; Plaintiff's Objection to Defendants' Proposed Exhibits [Doc. 189] is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and Plaintiff's Motion in Limine and Objections to Defendants' Deposition Designation [Doc. 190] is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on April 9, 2019. (AYB)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 160 Defendants' Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert for Violation of the Court's Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on February 19, 2019. (AYB)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER denying 157 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on January 11, 2019. (AYB)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER denying 127 the Motion to Compel Discovery Responses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on October 22, 2018. (AYB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoskins Oil Company, LLC v. Equilon Enterprises LLC et al (JRG1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hoskins Oil Company, LLC
Represented By: Gary Lionel Henry
Represented By: Jedidiah Charles McKeehan
Represented By: Eric Scott Ratliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equilon Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motiva Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coffman Oil Company, Inc.
Represented By: D Scott Hurley
Represented By: Holly B Hurley
Represented By: Ryan Neil Shamblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Downey Oil Company, Inc.
Represented By: John T McArthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Payan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?