Adkins v. Morgan County Tennessee et al
Plaintiff: James Travis Adkins
Defendant: Morgan County Tennessee, Glen Freytag, John Doe, 1, John No. 2 Doe, Jane Doe #1, Cody Lively and Trevor Shadden
Case Number: 3:2016cv00525
Filed: August 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Knox
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, To sum up what the Court is ordering: (1) Plaintiff's request to set aside the settlement agreement [Doc. 88, sealed] is DENIED; (2) The motion for partial final judgment filed by Defendants Heidel and SHP [Doc. 84] is GRANTED based on the mediated settlement agreement; and (3) A separate final judgment will enter pursuant to Rules 54(b) and 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, there being no just reason for delay.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 5/11/2018. (JCK)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 31 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 7/18/17. (JBR)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 29 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 7/11/17. (JBR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adkins v. Morgan County Tennessee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Travis Adkins
Represented By: Kimberly H Cambron
Represented By: Keith L Edmiston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan County Tennessee
Represented By: Arthur F Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Freytag
Represented By: Arthur F Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, 1
Represented By: Arthur F Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John No. 2 Doe
Represented By: Arthur F Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe #1
Represented By: Arthur F Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Lively
Represented By: Arthur F Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Shadden
Represented By: Arthur F Knight, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?