United States of America v. Fleishman
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Lori F. Fleishman
Case Number: 3:2017cv00094
Filed: March 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Knox
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Presiding Judge: C Clifford Shirley
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Per the parties' agreement, the Court GRANTS the Motion for Modification of Consent Order [Doc. 16 ] and DENIES AS MOOT the Motion for Additional Extension and Timeline [Doc. 13 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 10/23/17. (JBR)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying 8 Motion for Reconsideration ; adopting Report and Recommendations re 11 Report and Recommendations. The Court ACCEPTS and ADOPTS the R&R (Doc. 11). The Petition to Enforce IRS Summons (Doc. 1) is GRANTED. Respon dents Motion for Reconsideration and Additional Time (Doc. 8) is DENIED. It is hereby ORDERED: Respondent shall appear at the IRS offices located at 710 Locus Street, Knoxville, Tennessee, 37902, on October 13, 2017, at 9:00 a.m., before Revenue Offi cer Keaton, or other designee of the IRS, to provide testimony; and Respondent shall provide all documents sought in the IRS Summons (Doc. 1-1) to Revenue Officer Keaton, or other designee of the IRS, by October 13, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 10/12/2017. (BDG, )
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. It is hereby ORDERED that Respondent Lori Fleishman appear before this Court (Courtroom 3A, 800 Market Street, Knoxville, Tennessee, 37902) on September 12, 2017, at 2:00 p.m., to SHOW CAUSE as to why she should not be compelled to obey the Internal Revenue Service summons served upon her. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 7/25/17. (JBR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Fleishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Kyle Lamar Bishop(Designation United States Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lori F. Fleishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?