Mack v. R.L.R. Investments, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Mack
Defendant: R.L.R. Investments, LLC, Gator Freightways, Inc., R&L Carriers, Inc., R&L Transfer, Inc. and Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00450
Filed: October 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Knox
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
2 Judge: C Clifford Shirley
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Filing 55 STIPULATION of Dismissal case Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Gator Freightways, Inc., Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., R&L Carriers, Inc., R&L Transfer, Inc., R.L.R. Investments, LLC. (Powers, K)
August 22, 2018 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT Trial Date: 1/28/19; Case Reported Settled By William Vines, Mediator per Mediator's Report #54 ; Parties participated in mediation/arbitration. (ABF)
August 22, 2018 Filing 54 REPORT of Mediation (Vines, William)
August 13, 2018 Filing 53 First Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gator Freightways, Inc., Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., R&L Carriers, Inc., R&L Transfer, Inc., R.L.R. Investments, LLC.(Powers, K)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER, Defendants' Motion to Amend Answer and Memorandum in Support #51 is GRANTED. Defendants SHALL FILE their First Amended Answer [Doc. 51-1] as their operative pleading in CM/ECF on or before August 23 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 8/9/18. (ADA)
July 24, 2018 Filing 51 MOTION to Amend/Revise #11 Answer to Complaint Motion to Amend Answer and Memorandum in Support by Gator Freightways, Inc., Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., R&L Carriers, Inc., R&L Transfer, Inc., R.L.R. Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Answer)(Powers, K)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: For the reasons stated on the conference call, the deadlines set forth in the Court's scheduling order #25 are hereby CANCELLED. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint proposed scheduling order on or before August 20, 2018. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/23/18. (aws, )
July 19, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Travis R McDonough: Scheduling Conference held by phone on 7/19/2018. (hearing held w/o courtroom deputy) (GRE, )
July 6, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael Shroyer, Nick Ewing and Gerald Krisa by Kimberly Mack.(Ritchie, Wayne)
July 3, 2018 Filing 48 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Florida Transfer & Freight, Inc. on 07/02/2018 (Ritchie, Wayne)
July 2, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE by Kimberly Mack NOTICE OF ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Subpoena Duces Tecum to Florida Transfer & Freight, Inc.)(Ritchie, Wayne)
June 29, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2018 02:00 PM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Travis R McDonough. (AML, )
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting #45 Motion for Hearing. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 6/29/2018. (AML, )
June 26, 2018 Filing 45 Joint MOTION to Amend/Revise #25 Scheduling Order, , Joint MOTION for Hearing Interim Scheduling Conference by Gator Freightways, Inc., Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., R&L Carriers, Inc., R&L Transfer, Inc., R.L.R. Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Greg Lampkin)(Powers, K)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 AGREED ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY PARAMETERS AND DEPOSITION LIMITATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 6/21/18. (ABF)
June 18, 2018 Filing 43 Joint MOTION for Discovery Joint Motion Regarding Discovery Parameters and Deposition Limitations by Gator Freightways, Inc., Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., R&L Carriers, Inc., R&L Transfer, Inc., R.L.R. Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Agreed Order)(Powers, K)
May 24, 2018 Filing 42 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Samuel Ellison on 05/23/2018 (Ritchie, Wayne)
May 24, 2018 Filing 41 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Patrick T. McEvers on 05/23/2018 (Ritchie, Wayne)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: The parties appeared via telephone before the Court on May 21, 2018, over a discovery dispute. At this juncture, the Court declines to order Defendants to allow an inspection of the reconstructed facility because Plaintiff has not shown how such inspection will aid in determining ownership and control of the Subject Premises. The Court instructs the parties to proceed with discovery as planned. If written discovery and depositions do not resolve the issues relating to ownership and control of the Subject Premises, the Court will revisit Plaintiff's request for an inspection.Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 5/23/18. (ADA)
May 22, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE by Kimberly Mack Notice of Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Subpoena Duces Tecum to Samuel Ellison)(Ritchie, Wayne)
May 22, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE by Kimberly Mack Notice of Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Subpoena Duces Tecum to Patrick McEvers)(Ritchie, Wayne)
May 22, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jeff Harrell, Patrick McEvers, Jay Wells, Samuel Ellison, Jeff Carroll and Ron Watkins by Kimberly Mack.(Ritchie, Wayne)
May 21, 2018 Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin: Discovery Hearing held on 5/21/2018. The Court held a telephonic conference to address a discovery dispute in this matter. After hearing from counsel for both parties, the Court found that the parties should proceed with written discovery and depositions as planned. The Court finds that at this time Plaintiff's request is not relevant but could become relevant once further discovery is completed. If the Plaintiff wishes to renew her request following the completion of discovery and depositions, the Court will schedule an additional conference. (RLK)
May 14, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Hearing set for 5/21/2018 at 9:30 AM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin. The parties will initiate the call and call into chambers at 865-545-4260. The parties are to email a short summary (no more than 3 pages) outlining their dispute to holly_nease@tned.uscourts.gov by noon on Thursday, May 17th. (RLK)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 AGREED ORDER FOR THE PRODUCTION OF MEDICAL AND EMPLOYMENT RECORDS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 4/17/18. (ABF)
April 11, 2018 Filing 34 Joint MOTION Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Order for Production of Medical and Employment Records by Gator Freightways, Inc., Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., R&L Carriers, Inc., R&L Transfer, Inc., R.L.R. Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Agreed Order for the Production of Medical and Employment Records)(Powers, K)
March 28, 2018 Filing 33 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C on 03/28/2018 (Ritchie, Wayne)
March 28, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE by Kimberly Mack NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ON R & L CARRIERS SHARED SERVICES, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Subpoena Duces Tecum to R & L Carriers Shared Services, L.L.C.)(Ritchie, Wayne)
February 14, 2018 Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr no longer assigned to case per SO-18-02. (JBR)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on 1/23/18. (ABF)
January 12, 2018 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion for Entry of Agreed Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information Pursuant to Rule 26(c) by Gator Freightways, Inc., Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., R&L Carriers, Inc., R&L Transfer, Inc., R.L.R. Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Agreed Protective Order)(Powers, K)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #23 Motion for Protective Order Limiting the Scope to Discovery Pending a Ruling on Forthcoming Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on 1/2/18. (ABF)
December 12, 2017 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting the Scope of Discovery Pending Ruling on Forthcoming Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Gator Freightways, Inc., Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., R&L Carriers, Inc., R&L Transfer, Inc., R.L.R. Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Case - Johnson v. Dollar General Corporation)(Powers, K)
December 11, 2017 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting the Scope of Discovery Pending Ruling on Forthcoming Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER LIMITING THE SCOPE OF DISCOVERY filed by Kimberly Mack. (Ritchie, Wayne)
December 11, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE by Gator Freightways, Inc., Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., R&L Carriers, Inc., R&L Transfer, Inc., R.L.R. Investments, LLC re #23 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting the Scope of Discovery Pending Ruling on Forthcoming Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support Notice of Filing Affidavit of Michael Shroyer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Michael Shroyer, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Powers, K)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 1/28/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/30/17. (aws, )
November 28, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Travis R McDonough: Scheduling Conference held on 11/28/2017 in chambers w/o court reporter. (DJH, )
November 27, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE by Gator Freightways, Inc., Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., R&L Carriers, Inc., R&L Transfer, Inc., R.L.R. Investments, LLC Notice of Service of Defendants' Initial Disclosures (Powers, K)
November 27, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting the Scope of Discovery Pending Ruling on Forthcoming Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support by Gator Freightways, Inc., Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., R&L Carriers, Inc., R&L Transfer, Inc., R.L.R. Investments, LLC. (Powers, K)
November 27, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE by Kimberly Mack NOTICE OF SERVICE (Ritchie, Wayne)
November 27, 2017 Filing 21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Powers, K)
November 21, 2017 Filing 20 STIPULATION re #11 Answer to Complaint Joint Stipulation of Plaintiff and R&L Carriers, Inc. Regarding Service of Process by R&L Carriers, Inc.. (Powers, K)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 AM in Video Conference Room before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/15/2017. (TRT, )
November 14, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Gator Freightways, Inc., Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., R&L Carriers, Inc., R&L Transfer, Inc., R.L.R. Investments, LLC (Powers, K)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/8/17. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
November 7, 2017 Filing 16 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Gator Freightways, Inc.. (Powers, K)
November 7, 2017 Filing 15 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc.. (Powers, K)
November 7, 2017 Filing 14 Certificate of Corporate Interest by R&L Transfer, Inc.. (Powers, K)
November 7, 2017 Filing 13 Certificate of Corporate Interest by R&L Carriers, Inc.. (Powers, K)
November 7, 2017 Filing 12 Certificate of Corporate Interest by R.L.R. Investments, LLC. (Powers, K)
November 7, 2017 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gator Freightways, Inc., Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., R&L Carriers, Inc., R&L Transfer, Inc., R.L.R. Investments, LLC.(Powers, K)
October 17, 2017 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Mack. Gator Freightways, Inc. served on 10/17/2017. (Ritchie, Wayne)
October 17, 2017 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Mack. Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc. served on 10/17/2017. (Ritchie, Wayne)
October 17, 2017 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Mack. R&L Carriers, Inc. served on 10/17/2017. (Ritchie, Wayne)
October 17, 2017 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Mack. R&L Transfer, Inc. served on 10/17/2017. (Ritchie, Wayne)
October 17, 2017 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Mack. R.L.R. Investments, LLC served on 10/17/2017. (Ritchie, Wayne)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/17/17. (ABF)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/17/17. (ABF)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/17/17. (ABF)
October 16, 2017 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Gator Freightways, Inc., Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., R&L Carriers, Inc., R&L Transfer, Inc., R.L.R. Investments, LLC and returned to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons R&L Carriers, Inc, #2 Summons R&L Transfer, Inc, #3 Summons Greeenwood Motor Lines, Inc, #4 Summons Gator Freightways, Inc)(ABF)
October 16, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 Paid, Receipt #K3034216.), filed by Kimberly Mack. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(ABF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mack v. R.L.R. Investments, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Mack
Represented By: Wayne A Ritchie, II
Represented By: James R Stovall
Represented By: Jenny C Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.L.R. Investments, LLC
Represented By: Travis B Holly
Represented By: John M Phillips
Represented By: K Stephen Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gator Freightways, Inc.
Represented By: Travis B Holly
Represented By: John M Phillips
Represented By: K Stephen Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&L Carriers, Inc.
Represented By: Travis B Holly
Represented By: John M Phillips
Represented By: K Stephen Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&L Transfer, Inc.
Represented By: Travis B Holly
Represented By: John M Phillips
Represented By: K Stephen Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Travis B Holly
Represented By: John M Phillips
Represented By: K Stephen Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?