Matras et al v. Venture Resorts, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: M. M., C. M., Megan Matras and Christopher Matras
Defendant: James Plair, Katherine Plair, Gatlinburg Falls at the Park Resort Owners Association, Inc. and Venture Resorts, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00297
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Sevier
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on September 10, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AYB)
September 7, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2018 at 2:30 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Curtis L Collier. (CBS)
September 6, 2018 Filing 18 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Gatlinburg Falls at the Park Resort Owners Association, Inc.. (Cope, Jon)
September 6, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Gatlinburg Falls at the Park Resort Owners Association, Inc..(Cope, Jon)
September 6, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by James Plair, Katherine Plair, Venture Resorts, Inc..(Ward, Kenneth)
August 29, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by J Chad Hogue on behalf of Venture Resorts, Inc. (Hogue, J)
August 16, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by plaintiffs. James Plair served on 8/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Return Receipt) (AYB)
August 16, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed plaintiffs. Katherine Plair served on 8/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Return Receipt) (AYB)
August 15, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Extension by James Plair, Katherine Plair, Venture Resorts, Inc.. (Ward, Kenneth)
August 15, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth W Ward on behalf of James Plair, Katherine Plair, Venture Resorts, Inc. (Ward, Kenneth)
August 14, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, of Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Gatlinburg Falls at the Park Resort Owners Association, Inc.. (Cope, Jon)
August 2, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon M Cope on behalf of Gatlinburg Falls at the Park Resort Owners Association, Inc. (Cope, Jon)
August 2, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Gatlinburg Falls at the Park Resort Owners Association, Inc. Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cope, Jon)
July 31, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Megan Matras(Individually ), Megan Matras(on behalf of the minor children), Christopher Matras(Individually ), Christopher Matras(on behalf of the minor children). Venture Resorts, Inc. served on 7/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Certified Mail Return Receipt - Venture Resorts, Inc.)(Baker, Laura)
July 31, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Megan Matras(Individually ), Megan Matras(on behalf of the minor children), Christopher Matras(Individually ), Christopher Matras(on behalf of the minor children). Gatlinburg Falls at the Park Resort Owners Association, Inc. served on 7/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Certified Mail Return Receipt - Gatlinburg Falls at the Park Resort Owners Association, Inc.)(Baker, Laura)
July 24, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Gatlinburg Falls at the Park Resort Owners Association, Inc., James Plair, Katherine Plair, and Venture Resorts, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Gatlinburg Falls, #2 Summons James Plair, #3 Summons Katherine Plair) (AYB)
July 23, 2018 Filing fee in the amount of $ 400 (receipt number K3036049) received from Law Offices of John Day (AYB)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 7/20/2018. (JCK)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 7/20/2018. (JCK)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 7/20/2018. (JCK)
July 20, 2018 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (JCK)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Christopher Matras, M. M., C. M., Megan Matras. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Photos of the fallen dead tree and treehouse, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Covenants, Conditions, Restrictions and Easements for Gatlinburg Falls at the Park Resort A Planned Unit Development, #3 Exhibit Megan Matras medical bills, #4 Exhibit M.M. medical bills, #5 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Summons to Gatlinburg Falls at the Park Resort Owners Association, Inc., #7 Summons Summons to Venture Resorts, Inc., #8 Summons Summons to James Plair, #9 Supplement Summons to Katherine Plair)(Baker, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matras et al v. Venture Resorts, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. M.
Represented By: Laura Bishop Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. M.
Represented By: Laura Bishop Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Matras
Represented By: Laura Bishop Baker
Represented By: Elizabeth Noel Sitgreaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Matras
Represented By: Laura Bishop Baker
Represented By: Elizabeth Noel Sitgreaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Plair
Represented By: Kenneth W Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Plair
Represented By: Kenneth W Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gatlinburg Falls at the Park Resort Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Jon M Cope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venture Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: J Chad Hogue
Represented By: Kenneth W Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?