Hill v. TT of K. Pike, LLC
Plaintiff: Lawrence Hill
Defendant: TT of K. Pike, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00298
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before October 4, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 9/4/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA)
August 31, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by TT of K. Pike, LLC. (Wilson, Shelly)
August 21, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lawrence Hill. TT of K. Pike, LLC served on 8/14/2018. (Ehrlich, Craig)
August 9, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to TT of K. Pike, LLC. (RLK)
July 20, 2018 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint Corrected Summons by Lawrence Hill. (Ehrlich, Craig)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 07/20/2018. (CAT)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 07/20/2018. (CAT)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 07/20/2018. (CAT)
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint : INFORMATIONAL ONLY. For future reference please file Summons and Civil Cover Sheet in a non-fillable format. (CAT)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint : Please enter Plaintiff and Defendant's name at the top of the Summons and refile it using the event Supplement and link it back to the Complaint. Requirements due by 7/25/2018. (CAT)
July 20, 2018 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (CAT)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TT of K. Pike, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3722421.), filed by Lawrence Hill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - RISC, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Ehrlich, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. TT of K. Pike, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Hill
Represented By: Craig J Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TT of K. Pike, LLC
Represented By: Shelly L Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?