United States of America v. $19,771.00 U.S. currency (PLR1)

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $19,771.00 U.S. currency
Interested Party: Chase Clark
Case Number: 3:2018cv00315
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Blount
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Filing 10 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date September 8, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Advertisement Certification Report, #2 Exhibit B - Advertisement Copy)(Svolto, Anne-Marie)
August 29, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Chase Clark. (White, Robert)
August 28, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Chase Clark served on 8/24/2018. (JBR)
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 Verified Claim. (White, Robert) Modified text on 8/28/2018 (JBR).
August 14, 2018 Filing 6 Return of Service on Chase Clark c/o Robert W. White, Esq. on 8/13/2018(JBR)
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 WARRANT Returned Executed as to $19,771.00. (JBR) (Additional attachment(s) provided by USMS and added on 8/21/2018: #1 Other Return of Service) (JBR).
August 1, 2018 Filing 4 Administrative Notice to Counsel - Civil cover sheet : (KFB, )
August 1, 2018 AMENDED WARRANT of Arrest In Rem issued. Serviced by hand delivery to USM. (KFB, ) USM 285 form included.
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by United States of America of filing Amended Warrant of Arrest In Rem (Svolto, Anne-Marie)
July 31, 2018 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (KFB, )
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by United States of America of Complaint for Forfeiture (Svolto, Anne-Marie)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against $19,771.00 U.S. currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Other Warrant for Arrest In Rem)(Svolto, Anne-Marie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $19,771.00 U.S. currency (PLR1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $19,771.00 U.S. currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Anne-Marie Svolto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Chase Clark
Represented By: Robert W White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?