Centennial Bluff Condominium Association, Inc. v. Atlas Roofing Corporation (TV2)
Plaintiff: Centennial Bluff Condominium Association, Inc.
Defendant: Atlas Roofing Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv00403
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 11/13/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified on 11/14/2018 to indicate c/m to Jennifer Collins and Joel Piper (ABF).
November 9, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joel G. Pieper ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3814634.) filed by Atlas Roofing Corporation, #21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer Saffold Collins ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3814630.) filed by Atlas Roofing Corporation (ABF)
November 9, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Atlas Roofing Corporation (Doran, James)
November 9, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joel G. Pieper ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3814634.) by Atlas Roofing Corporation. (Doran, James)
November 9, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer Saffold Collins ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3814630.) by Atlas Roofing Corporation. (Doran, James)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 10/30/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified on 10/31/2018 to indicate c/m to Daniel Bryson (ABF).
October 26, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Centennial Bluff Condominium Association, Inc. Certificate of Good Standing is over 30 days old, so Clerk's office verified good standing with Middle District of North Carolina (AML, )
October 26, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave for Daniel K. Bryson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 paid, receipt C1016089) by Centennial Bluff Condominium Association, Inc. (AML, )
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 10/5/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified on 10/9/2018 to note c/m with ECF info to Scott Harris Whitfield Bryson & Mason LLP (NC) P.O. Box 12638 Raleigh, NC 27605 (ADA).
October 3, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE FROM THE MDL PANEL: The Clerk of the Panel has determined that this action is not appropriate for inclusion on MDL 2495. (ABF)
October 1, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFIED COPIES OF REMOVAL DOCUMENTS, received from Anderson County Circuit Court. (ADA)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/28/18. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
September 27, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Centennial Bluff Condominium Association, Inc. (ABF)
September 27, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Scott Harris to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #K3036464.) by Centennial Bluff Condominium Association, Inc.. (ABF)
September 27, 2018 Filing 13 Atlas Roofing Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint by Atlas Roofing Corporation.(Doran, James)
September 27, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE by Atlas Roofing Corporation (Notice of Filing Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action with JPMDL) (Attachments: #1 Other Attachment - Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action MDL Docket No. 2495)(Doran, James)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 9/27/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified on 9/27/2018 to indicate c/m to John C. Whitfield (ABF).
September 26, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Centennial Bluff Condominium Association, Inc. (ABF)
September 26, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for John C. Whitfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 Paid, Receipt #K3036456.) by Centennial Bluff Condominium Association, Inc. (ABF) Modified on 9/26/2018; certificate of good standing attached is more than 30 days old, Clerk's Office has verified with the Western District of TN that Mr. Whitfield is currently in good standing (ABF).
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Centennial Bluff Condominium Association, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Centennial Bluff Condominium Association, Inc. for Centennial Bluff Condominium Association, Inc.. (Taylor, Caroline)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/24/2018. (AML, ) Order mailed to Attorneys Harris, Whitfield and Bryson.
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/24/2018. (AML, ) Mailed to Attorneys Harris, Whitfield and Bryson.
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/24/2018. (AML, ) Mailed to Attorneys Harris, Whitfield and Bryson.
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) mailed to John C. Whitfield. (AML, )
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) mailed to Scott Harris. (AML, )
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) mailed to Attorney Daniel Bryson. (AML, )
September 24, 2018 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Centennial Bluff Condominium Association, Inc. (AML, )
September 24, 2018 Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (AML, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Atlas Roofing Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Hood Companies, Inc. for Atlas Roofing Corporation. (Doran, James)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Anderson County, Tennessee, case number B8LA0128. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3775204), filed by Atlas Roofing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Secretary of State Record, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpts, docket entries 57-1 and 57-23, #4 Exhibit D - Eagle View Reports, #5 Exhibit E - Notification to State Court and Counsel, #6 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Doran, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centennial Bluff Condominium Association, Inc. v. Atlas Roofing Corporation (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centennial Bluff Condominium Association, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel K Bryson
Represented By: Scott Harris
Represented By: John C. Whitfield
Represented By: Caroline Ramsey Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Roofing Corporation
Represented By: James M Doran, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer S Collins
Represented By: Joel G Pieper
Represented By: Robert David Boon, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?