Epps v. U.S. Bank National Association, et. al. (PLR2)
Plaintiff: Gary Epps
Defendant: BSCMS 1999-CLF1 Clinton Highway REO, LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee, Successor to Bank of America, N.A. (Successor by merger to LaSalle Bank, N.A.), as Trustee, for the Registered Holders of Bear Stearns Commercial Mortgage Securities, Inc. and U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 3:2018cv00405
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 9/27/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified to reflect copy mailed Aaron Jackson on 9/27/2018 (JBR).
September 27, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Aaron C. Jackson ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3779141.) filed by BSCMS 1999-CLF1 Clinton Highway Reo, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association (JBR)
September 26, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Aaron C. Jackson ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3779141.) by BSCMS 1999-CLF1 Clinton Highway Reo, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association. (Malone, Michael)
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 Certificate of Corporate Interest by BSCMS 1999-CLF1 Clinton Highway Reo, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association. (Malone, Michael)
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency to Attorney Jackson(Pro Hac). (SAC, )Mailed Notice to Atty Jackson.
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/25/2018. (SAC, )Order mailed to Atty Jackson.
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/25/2018. (SAC, )Order mailed to Atty Jackson.
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 9/25/2018. (SAC, )
September 25, 2018 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Bear Stearns Commercial Mortgage Securities, Inc, Commerical Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, U.S. Bank National Association. (SAC, )
September 25, 2018 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (SAC, )
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Chancery Court for Knox County, Tennessee, case number 196632-2. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3776277), filed by BSCMS 1999-CLF1 Clinton Highway REO, LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee, Successor to Bank of America, N.A. (Successor by merger to LaSalle Bank, N.A.), as Trustee, for the Registered Holders of Bear Stearns Commercial Mortgage Securities, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Malone, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epps v. U.S. Bank National Association, et. al. (PLR2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Epps
Represented By: Thomas M Leveille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSCMS 1999-CLF1 Clinton Highway REO, LLC
Represented By: Michael A Malone
Represented By: Aaron C Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A., as Trustee, Successor to Bank of America, N.A. (Successor by merger to LaSalle Bank, N.A.), as Trustee, for the Registered Holders of Bear Stearns Commercial Mortgage Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Michael A Malone
Represented By: Aaron C Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?