Moore et al v. Westgate Resorts Ltd., L.P. a/k/a Westgate Resorts Ltd. et al (JRG1)
Plaintiff: Laura Spado, Ryan Spado, Larry Gilliland, Marilyn Moore, Ellen Gilliland and Cynthia Loveless
Defendant: Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC, Central Florida Investments, Inc, CFI Resorts Management, Inc., Westgate Resorts Ltd., L.P. a/k/a Westgate Resorts Ltd., Westgate Resorts, Inc., Westgate Marketing, LLC and Westgate Resorts Ltd., L.P.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00410
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 11/13/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified on 11/14/2018 to indicate c/m to Benjamin New and Jeffrey Backman (ABF).
November 8, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Benjamin Eliot New ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3813725.) filed by Westgate Marketing, LLC, Westgate Resorts, Inc., Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC, Westgate Resorts Ltd., L.P., CFI Resorts Management, Inc., Central Florida Investments, Inc (ABF)
November 8, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Benjamin Eliot New ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3813725.) by CFI Resorts Management, Inc., Central Florida Investments, Inc, Westgate Marketing, LLC, Westgate Resorts Ltd., L.P., Westgate Resorts, Inc., Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC. (Vance, Robert)
November 5, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey A. Backman, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3810090.) filed by Westgate Marketing, LLC, Westgate Resorts, Inc., Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC, Westgate Resorts Ltd., L.P., CFI Resorts Management, Inc., Central Florida Investments, Inc, #22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard W. Epstein, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3810089.) filed by Westgate Marketing, LLC, Westgate Resorts, Inc., Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC, Westgate Resorts Ltd., L.P., CFI Resorts Management, Inc., Central Florida Investments, Inc (ABF, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey A. Backman, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3810090.) by CFI Resorts Management, Inc., Central Florida Investments, Inc, Westgate Marketing, LLC, Westgate Resorts Ltd., L.P., Westgate Resorts, Inc., Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC. (Vance, Robert)
November 2, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Richard W. Epstein, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3810089.) by CFI Resorts Management, Inc., Central Florida Investments, Inc, Westgate Marketing, LLC, Westgate Resorts Ltd., L.P., Westgate Resorts, Inc., Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC. (Vance, Robert)
November 2, 2018 Filing 21 Certificate of Corporate Interest by CFI Resorts Management, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Central Florida Investments, Inc for CFI Resorts Management, Inc.. (Vance, Robert)
November 2, 2018 Filing 20 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC. (Vance, Robert)
November 2, 2018 Filing 19 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Westgate Marketing, LLC. (Vance, Robert)
November 2, 2018 Filing 18 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Westgate Resorts, Inc.. (Vance, Robert)
November 2, 2018 Filing 17 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Central Florida Investments, Inc. (Vance, Robert)
November 2, 2018 Filing 16 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Westgate Resorts Ltd., L.P.. (Vance, Robert)
November 2, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L Vance on behalf of All Defendants (Vance, Robert)
October 9, 2018 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Larry Gilliland, Laura Spado, Ryan Spado, Cynthia Loveless, Marilyn Moore, Ellen Gilliland. CFI Resorts Management, Inc. waiver sent on 10/3/2018. (Chalos, Mark)
October 9, 2018 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Larry Gilliland, Laura Spado, Ryan Spado, Cynthia Loveless, Marilyn Moore, Ellen Gilliland. Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC waiver sent on 10/3/2018. (Chalos, Mark)
October 9, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Larry Gilliland, Laura Spado, Ryan Spado, Cynthia Loveless, Marilyn Moore, Ellen Gilliland. Westgate Marketing, LLC waiver sent on 10/3/2018. (Chalos, Mark)
October 9, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Larry Gilliland, Laura Spado, Ryan Spado, Cynthia Loveless, Marilyn Moore, Ellen Gilliland. Westgate Resorts, Inc. waiver sent on 10/3/2018. (Chalos, Mark)
October 9, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Larry Gilliland, Laura Spado, Ryan Spado, Cynthia Loveless, Marilyn Moore, Ellen Gilliland. Central Florida Investments, Inc waiver sent on 10/3/2018. (Chalos, Mark)
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Larry Gilliland, Laura Spado, Ryan Spado, Cynthia Loveless, Marilyn Moore, Ellen Gilliland. Westgate Resorts Ltd., L.P. waiver sent on 10/3/2018. (Chalos, Mark)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Bruce Guyton on 10/5/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified on 10/9/2018 to note c/m, with ECF info to John T Spragens Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, LLP (Nashville) 222 2nde Avenue South Suite 1640 Nashville, TN 37201 (ADA).
October 4, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John T. Spragens ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3785898.) filed by Laura Spado, Cynthia Loveless, Larry Gilliland, Ryan Spado, Ellen Gilliland, Marilyn Moore (ABF)
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John T. Spragens ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3785898.) by Ellen Gilliland, Larry Gilliland, Cynthia Loveless, Marilyn Moore, Laura Spado, Ryan Spado. (Attachments: #1 Other certificate of good standing, #2 Other certificate of service)(Chalos, Mark)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 9/26/18. (ABF)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 9/26/18. (ABF)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 9/26/18. (ABF)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CFI Resorts Management, Inc., Central Florida Investments, Inc, Westgate Marketing, LLC, Westgate Resorts Ltd., L.P., Westgate Resorts, Inc., Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Central Florida Investments, #2 Summons CFI Resorts, #3 Summons Westgate Marketing, #4 Summons Westgate Resorts Inc, #5 Summons Westgate Vacation Villas)(ABF)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) to John T. Spragens: Attorney is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistratejudge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motioncan be found here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/docs/pro_hac_vice.pdf.(c/m to John T Spragens, Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, LLP (Nashville), 222 2nde Avenue South, Suite 1640, Nashville, TN 37201) (ABF, )
September 25, 2018 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (ABF)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CFI Resorts Management, Inc., Central Florida Investments, Inc, Westgate Marketing, LLC, Westgate Resorts Ltd., L.P. a/k/a Westgate Resorts Ltd., Westgate Resorts, Inc., Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3777904.), filed by Larry Gilliland, Laura Spado, Ryan Spado, Cynthia Loveless, Marilyn Moore, Ellen Gilliland. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Other Westgate Resorts Ltd L.P. Summons, #3 Other Central Florida Investments, Inc. Summons, #4 Other Westgate Resorts, Inc. Summons, #5 Other Westgate Marketing, LLC Summons, #6 Other Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC Summons, #7 Other CFI Resorts Management, Inc. Summons)(Chalos, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore et al v. Westgate Resorts Ltd., L.P. a/k/a Westgate Resorts Ltd. et al (JRG1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westgate Vacation Villas, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin E New
Represented By: Richard Wayne Epstein
Represented By: Jeffrey A Backman
Represented By: Robert L Vance
Represented By: Gregory C Logue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Florida Investments, Inc
Represented By: Benjamin E New
Represented By: Richard Wayne Epstein
Represented By: Jeffrey A Backman
Represented By: Robert L Vance
Represented By: Gregory C Logue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CFI Resorts Management, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin E New
Represented By: Richard Wayne Epstein
Represented By: Jeffrey A Backman
Represented By: Robert L Vance
Represented By: Gregory C Logue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westgate Resorts Ltd., L.P. a/k/a Westgate Resorts Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westgate Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin E New
Represented By: Richard Wayne Epstein
Represented By: Jeffrey A Backman
Represented By: Robert L Vance
Represented By: Gregory C Logue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westgate Marketing, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin E New
Represented By: Richard Wayne Epstein
Represented By: Jeffrey A Backman
Represented By: Robert L Vance
Represented By: Gregory C Logue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westgate Resorts Ltd., L.P.
Represented By: Benjamin E New
Represented By: Richard Wayne Epstein
Represented By: Jeffrey A Backman
Represented By: Robert L Vance
Represented By: Gregory C Logue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Spado
Represented By: Mark P Chalos
Represented By: John T Spragens
Represented By: John O Belcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Spado
Represented By: Mark P Chalos
Represented By: John T Spragens
Represented By: John O Belcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Gilliland
Represented By: Mark P Chalos
Represented By: John T Spragens
Represented By: John O Belcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Moore
Represented By: Mark P Chalos
Represented By: John T Spragens
Represented By: John O Belcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Gilliland
Represented By: Mark P Chalos
Represented By: John T Spragens
Represented By: John O Belcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Loveless
Represented By: Mark P Chalos
Represented By: John T Spragens
Represented By: John O Belcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?