Gudger v. Accounts Research, Inc. (TV1)
Plaintiff: Ashley D Gudger
Defendant: Accounts Research, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00422
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Debra C Poplin
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley D Gudger. All Defendants. (Lee, Alan)
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 Alias Summons Issued as to Accounts Research, Inc. (ABF)
November 4, 2018 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint,, Alias Summons - Accounts Research by Ashley D Gudger. (Lee, Alan)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on September 28, 2018. (RLK)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on September 28, 2018. (RLK)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on September 28, 2018. (RLK)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Accounts Research, Inc. (RLK)
September 28, 2018 Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (RLK)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Accounts Research, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3780377.), filed by Ashley D Gudger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Aug 17, 2017 Coll Ltr, #2 Exhibit 2 - Initial postdated checks, #3 Exhibit 3 - Jan 16, 2018 Coll Ltr, #4 Exhibit 4 - Feb 8, 2018 Coll Ltr, #5 Exhibit 5 - Feb 19, 2018 Coll Ltr, #6 Exhibit 6 - Mar 16, 2018 Coll Ltr, #7 Exhibit 7 - Apr 2, 2018 Ltr sent by Plaintiff, #8 Exhibit 8 - Additional postdated checks, #9 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons - Accounts Research)(Lee, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gudger v. Accounts Research, Inc. (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley D Gudger
Represented By: Alan C Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accounts Research, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?