Family Brands, LLC v. J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Plaintiff: Family Brands, LLC
Defendant: Greenline Express Transportation Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00432
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION Stipulation To Extend Time For Defendant Greenline Express Transportation Inc. To Respond To Defendant J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.'s Third-Party Complaint by Greenline Express Transportation Inc.. (Spitler, Brian)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on 11/2/18. (ABF)
November 2, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.. Greenline Express Transportation Inc. served on 10/29/2018. (Powers, K)
November 2, 2018 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Powers, K)
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Extend Deadlines [Docs. 7 & 8] by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Powers, K)
October 24, 2018 Filing 10 Third-Party Summons Issued as to Greenline Express Transportation Inc.. (ABF)
October 23, 2018 Filing 9 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Greenline Express Transportation Inc., filed by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons on a Third-Party Complaint)(Powers, K)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on October 12, 2018. (KLWa, )
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Harry S. Mattice, Jr on 10/12/18. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge) (ADA)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc..(Powers, K)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on October 2, 2018. (RLK)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on October 2, 2018. (RLK)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on October 2, 2018. (RLK)
October 2, 2018 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (RLK)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent J.B. Hunt Transport Services, Inc. for J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Powers, K)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Tennessee at Loudon County, case number 2018CV76. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3783151), filed by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court documents, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff and state court notices, #3 Other Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Powers, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Family Brands, LLC v. J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Family Brands, LLC
Represented By: James C Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Represented By: K Stephen Powers
Represented By: Travis B Holly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenline Express Transportation Inc.
Represented By: Brian Stephen Spitler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?