Purkey v. Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (TV2)
Plaintiff: Robert Purkey
Defendant: Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00445
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/27/18. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (ABF)
November 26, 2018 Filing 10 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Wakefield & Associates, Inc.. (Leeth, Alan)
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Wakefield & Associates, Inc..(Leeth, Alan)
November 21, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan D. Leeth on behalf of Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (Leeth, Alan)
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION For Extension of Time to File Answer by Wakefield & Associates, Inc.. (Fisher, Russell)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Purkey. Wakefield & Associates, Inc. served on 10/15/18 (Lee, Alan) Modified on 10/26/2018 (JBR).
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/12/2018. (BDG, )
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/12/2018. (BDG, )
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/12/2018. (BDG, )
October 12, 2018 Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (BDG, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (BDG, )
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3790583.), filed by Robert Purkey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Oct 10, 2017 Coll Lawsuit, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Wakefield)(Lee, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purkey v. Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Purkey
Represented By: Alan C Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Alan D. Leeth
Represented By: Russell Thomas Fisher
Represented By: Samuel Aitken Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?