Price v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Tony T. Price
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2018cv00459
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tony T. Price. Social Security Administration served as to all agencies on 11/13/2018. (Osterhout, Karl) Modified on 11/28/2018 (ADA).
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 Administrative Notice to Counsel re #8 Affidavit of Service : refiling requirements due by 12/3/2018. (ADA)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 (Summons filed as #10 ) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, IFP Order and Plaintiff's SSN served on U.S. Attorney, OGC, Attorney Gen on 11/13/2018, filed by Tony T. Price. (Osterhout, Karl) Modified on 11/28/2018 (ADA).
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 11/5/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA)
November 1, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE re IFP Service per #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ADA)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ADA)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 10/31/18. (ADA)
October 26, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete for Karl Osterhout regarding document: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3803929.) filed by Tony T. Price (CAT)
October 26, 2018 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (CAT)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3803929.) by Tony T. Price. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing PA Supreme Court, #2 Certificate of Good Standing WDPA, #3 Proposed Order)(Osterhout, Karl)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tony T. Price. (Osterhout, Karl)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Tony T. Price. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for US Attorney, #3 Summons for OGC, #4 Summons for Atty Gen)(Osterhout, Karl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony T. Price
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?