Gaines v. Two Doors Down, LLC (TV1)

Plaintiff: DeMarcus gaines
Defendant: two doors down, llc
Case Number: 3:2018cv00484
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/7/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (JBR)
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Two Doors Down, LLC.(Costner, Joseph)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Two Doors Down, LLC. (Costner, Joseph)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E Costner on behalf of Two Doors Down, LLC (Costner, Joseph)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Two Doors Down, LLC. (ADA)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Corrected Summons by DeMarcus Gaines. (Berg, Darren)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/16/2018. (AML, )
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/15/2018. (AML, )
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/16/2018. (AML, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel re #1 Summons for Complaint : requirements due by 11/21/2018. (AML, )
November 16, 2018 Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (AML, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Two Doors Down, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3817752.), filed by DeMarcus gaines. (Attachments: #1 Other civil cover sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Berg, Darren) Modified on 11/16/2018 to correct the docket text (AML, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaines v. Two Doors Down, LLC (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: two doors down, llc
Represented By: Joseph E Costner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeMarcus gaines
Represented By: Darren V Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?